This case was last updated from Richmond County New York Courts on 11/19/2021 at 06:35:58 (UTC).

VARGAS, ANGEL vs. LAMBERTI, JACQUELINE E.

Case Summary

On 10/27/2015 VARGAS, ANGEL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LAMBERTI, JACQUELINE E. This case was filed in Richmond County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Colon, Hon. Lizette. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2015

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Colon, Hon. Lizette

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VARGAS, ANGEL

Defendant

LAMBERTI, JACQUELINE E.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WOOD SMITH HENNING BERMAN LLP

Attorney at WOOD SMITH HENNING BERMAN LLP

685 3Rd Ave

New York, NY 10017-4024

Maggiano, DiGirolamo & Lizzi, P.C.

Attorney at Maggiano, DiGirolamo & Lizzi, P.C.

201 Columbia Ave

Fort Lee, NJ 07024-4134

THE DEARIE LAW FIRM, P.C.

Attorney at THE DEARIE LAW FIRM, P.C.

515 Madison Ave Fl 16

New York, NY 10022-5403

Defendant Attorney

SHEARER PC

Attorney at SHEARER PC

90 Forest Ave Fl 2

Locust Valley, NY 11560-1746

 

Court Documents

APPELLATE COURT DECISION/ORDER (CERTIFIED COPY)

Briefs and record on appeal in archives

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

Affidavit of Service_Notice Of Entry 2nd Department Order_09.24.2020

NOTICE OF ENTRY

Notice of Entry and Order , Second Department Affirming Denial of Def.-SJM_09.23.2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Shearer, D.; Filed: 07/18/2019; Received: 07/18/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Shearer, D.; Filed: 07/18/2019; Received: 07/18/2019

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #002)

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #002); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/17/2019; Received: 07/17/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002); Filed By: Shearer, D.; Filed: 06/27/2019; Received: 06/27/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #002) June 20, 2019 Order

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #002) June 20, 2019 Order; Filed By: Shearer, D.; Filed: 06/27/2019; Received: 06/27/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #002) Defendants' Prior Motion for Stay of Trial

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #002) Defendants' Prior Motion for Stay of Trial; Filed By: Shearer, D.; Filed: 06/27/2019; Received: 06/27/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #002) Defendants' Reply Affirmation in Further Support

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #002) Defendants' Reply Affirmation in Further Support; Filed By: Shearer, D.; Filed: 06/27/2019; Received: 06/27/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) Plaintiff's Affirmation in Opposition

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) Plaintiff's Affirmation in Opposition; Filed By: Shearer, D.; Filed: 06/27/2019; Received: 06/27/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) Defendants' Summary Judgment Motion

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) Defendants' Summary Judgment Motion; Filed By: Shearer, D.; Filed: 06/27/2019; Received: 06/27/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Appeal

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Appeal; Filed By: Shearer, D.; Filed: 06/27/2019; Received: 06/27/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #002)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #002); Filed By: Shearer, D.; Filed: 06/27/2019; Received: 06/27/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Shearer, D.; Filed: 06/27/2019; Received: 06/27/2019

ORDER - CERTIFICATION

ORDER - CERTIFICATION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/05/2018; Received: 03/05/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A Certification Order

EXHIBIT(S) - A Certification Order; Filed By: Dearie, J.; Filed: 03/02/2018; Received: 03/02/2018

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Settled; Justice Part: Colon, Hon. Lizette IAS Part 21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Justice Part: Colon, Hon. Lizette Settlement Conf/Mediation Part

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Stay; Justice Part: Soos, Robert Settlement Conf/Mediation Part; Remarks: 9:30 AM ROOM 114, 18 RICHMOND TERRACE (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Motion-Other; Outcome Type: Signed; Justice Part: Marrazzo Jr., Hon. Orlando IAS Part 21 Mtions; Remarks: GRANTED (Conversion); Motion Seq: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 2; Relief Sought: Stay; Submit Date: 07/16/2019; Answer Demanded: No; Status: Decided: 07/16/2019 Signed Before Justice: Marrazzo Jr., Hon. Orlando; Decision: Oral; Order Signed Date: 07/16/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Marrazzo Jr., Hon. Orlando IAS Part 21; Remarks: CC (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Marrazzo Jr., Hon. Orlando DCM Part 21; Remarks: CC (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Marrazzo Jr., Hon. Orlando DCM Part 21; Remarks: CC (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Marrazzo Jr., Hon. Orlando DCM Part 21; Remarks: CC (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Marrazzo Jr., Hon. Orlando DCM Part 21; Remarks: CC (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 03/14/2017
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Green, Hon. Desmond A. IAS Part 3; Remarks: STATUS (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Green, Hon. Desmond A. IAS Part 3; Remarks: CC (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Green, Hon. Desmond A. IAS Part 3; Remarks: CC (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Green, Hon. Desmond A. IAS Part 3; Remarks: CC (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Green, Hon. Desmond A. IAS Part 3; Remarks: CC (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Green, Hon. Desmond A. IAS Part 3; Remarks: CC (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Green, Hon. Desmond A. IAS Part 3; Remarks: CC (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Green, Hon. Desmond A. IAS Part 3; Remarks: CC (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Green, Hon. Desmond A. IAS Part 3; Remarks: CC (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Green, Hon. Desmond A. IAS Part 3; Remarks: PC (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less