This case was last updated from Richmond County New York Courts on 11/19/2021 at 06:02:03 (UTC).

LOESCH, VERONICA vs. STATEN ISLAND UNIVERSITY

Case Summary

On 08/26/2015 LOESCH, VERONICA filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against STATEN ISLAND UNIVERSITY. This case was filed in Richmond County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Marin, Hon. Alan C.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2015

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Marin, Hon. Alan C.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOESCH, VERONICA

Defendant

STATEN ISLAND UNIVERSITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LANDERS & CERNIGLIARO, P.C.

Attorney at LANDERS & CERNIGLIARO, P.C.

1 Old Country Rd Ste 400

Carle Place, NY 11514-1852

Defendant Attorney

VASLAS, LEPOWSKY, HAUSS & DANKE LLP

Attorney at VASLAS, LEPOWSKY, HAUSS & DANKE LLP

201 Edward Curry Ave Ste 100

Staten Island, NY 10314-7101

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Mastro, W.; Filed: 12/15/2017; Received: 12/15/2017

PRE-ARGUMENT STATEMENT

PRE-ARGUMENT STATEMENT; Filed By: Landers, S.; Filed: 08/21/2017; Received: 08/21/2017

NOTICE OF APPEAL/RADI/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF APPEAL/RADI/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Landers, S.; Filed: 08/21/2017; Received: 08/21/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Mastro, W.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Mastro, W.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001); Filed By: Mastro, W.; Filed: 07/12/2017; Received: 07/12/2017

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001) Addendum to Atty Affirm in Opp to Mot to Preclude

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001) Addendum to Atty Affirm in Opp to Mot to Preclude; Filed By: Landers, S.; Filed: 07/11/2017; Received: 07/11/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Letter

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Letter; Filed By: Landers, S.; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Transcript Pages

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Transcript Pages; Filed By: Landers, S.; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Letter & Authorization

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Letter & Authorization; Filed By: Landers, S.; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Medical Records

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Medical Records; Filed By: Landers, S.; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Physician's Affirmation

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Physician's Affirmation; Filed By: Landers, S.; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Landers, S.; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Mastro, W.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #001) Expert exchange and report

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #001) Expert exchange and report; Filed By: Mastro, W.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) NOI and Cert of Readiness

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) NOI and Cert of Readiness; Filed By: Mastro, W.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Settled; Justice Part: Marin, Hon. Alan C. Trial Part 17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Trial-Jury; Outcome Type: Continued; Justice Part: Marin, Hon. Alan C. Trial Part 17; Remarks: Supreme Trial (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Trial-Jury; Outcome Type: Commenced; Justice Part: Marin, Hon. Alan C. Trial Part 17; Remarks: Supreme Trial (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Reassignment; Justice Part: Scheduling Judge, Trial Jury Coordinating Part 8; Remarks: TO TP17 (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Scheduling Judge, Trial Jury Coordinating Part 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Scheduling Judge, Trial Jury Coordinating Part 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Motion-Other; Outcome Type: Granted; Justice Part: Troia, Hon. Charles M. DCM Part 1M; Motion Seq: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Scheduling Judge, Trial Jury Coordinating Part 8; Remarks: 6/5/17 SET CONF (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Motion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Troia, Hon. Charles M. DCM Part 1M; Motion Seq: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Motion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Troia, Hon. Charles M. DCM Part 1M; Motion Seq: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Scheduling Judge, Trial Jury Coordinating Part 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Reassignment; Justice Part: Troia, Hon. Charles M. DCM Part 1; Remarks: FROM DCM1, CT, TO JCP8, JM (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Troia, Hon. Charles M. DCM Part 1; Remarks: CERT CONF (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Troia, Hon. Charles M. DCM Part 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Troia, Hon. Charles M. DCM Part 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Troia, Hon. Charles M. DCM Part 1; Remarks: CC (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Troia, Hon. Charles M. DCM Part 1; Remarks: C/JUDGE (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Troia, Hon. Charles M. DCM Part 1; Remarks: CT ADV (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Troia, Hon. Charles M. DCM Part 1; Remarks: CC (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Troia, Hon. Charles M. DCM Part 1; Remarks: PC (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less