This case was last updated from Jefferson County New York Courts on 03/31/2023 at 11:08:45 (UTC).

LISA M MAHON vs. JEFFERSON A MAHON

Case Summary

On 02/09/2015 LISA M MAHON filed an Other lawsuit against JEFFERSON A MAHON. This case was filed in Jefferson County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Jefferson, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Mc Clusky, Hon. James P.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2015

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Jefferson, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Mc Clusky, Hon. James P.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LISA M MAHON

Defendant

JEFFERSON A MAHON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/21/2015

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Post-CPLR 325(d); Justice Part: Mc Clusky, Hon. James P. (Court Activity)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2015

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 01:30 PM; Court Date Purpose: Trial-Non-Jury; Outcome Type: Pre Trial Conference; Justice Part: Mc Clusky, Hon. James P. (Pre-Trial Conference)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2015

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Motion-Other; Outcome Type: Decided; Justice Part: Mc Clusky, Hon. James P. (Motion Part); Motion Seq: 2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2015

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Motion-Other; Outcome Type: Return Date; Justice Part: Mc Clusky, Hon. James P. (Motion Part); Motion Seq: 2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2015

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Post-Note of Issue Restoration; Justice Part: Mc Clusky, Hon. James P. (Court Activity)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2015

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Motion-Other; Outcome Type: Motion Filed; Justice Part: Mc Clusky, Hon. James P. (Motion Part); Motion Seq: 2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2015

DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 2; Submit Date: 10/20/2015; Answer Demanded: No; Status: Decided: 10/20/2015 Decided Before Justice: Mc Clusky, Hon. James P.; Order Signed Date: 10/20/2015

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/25/2015

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Post-Judgment; Justice Part: Mc Clusky, Hon. James P. (Court Activity)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2015

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 01:30 PM; Court Date Purpose: Trial-Non-Jury; Outcome Type: Pre Trial Conference; Justice Part: Mc Clusky, Hon. James P. (Pre-Trial Conference)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2015

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 01:30 PM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Preliminary; Outcome Type: Preliminary Conference; Justice Part: Mc Clusky, Hon. James P. (Prelim. Conference)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/20/2015

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Motion-Other; Outcome Type: Decided; Justice Part: Mc Clusky, Hon. James P. (Motion Part); Motion Seq: 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2015

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 01:00 PM; Court Date Purpose: Trial-Non-Jury; Outcome Type: Pre Trial Conference; Justice Part: Mc Clusky, Hon. James P. (Pre-Trial Conference)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2015

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Motion-Other; Outcome Type: Return Date; Justice Part: Mc Clusky, Hon. James P. (Motion Part); Motion Seq: 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/26/2015

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Post-Note of Issue Restoration; Justice Part: Mc Clusky, Hon. James P. (Court Activity)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/26/2015

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Transferred from IAS Justice; Justice Part: Schwerzmann, Hon. Peter A. Schwerzmann (Court Activity)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/26/2015

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Motion-Other; Outcome Type: Motion Filed; Justice Part: Mc Clusky, Hon. James P. (Motion Part); Motion Seq: 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/26/2015

DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 1; Submit Date: 04/20/2015; Answer Demanded: No; Status: Decided: 04/20/2015 Decided Before Justice: Mc Clusky, Hon. James P.; Order Signed Date: 04/20/2015

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/25/2015

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Post-Judgment; Justice Part: Schwerzmann, Hon. Peter A. Schwerzmann (Court Activity)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/09/2015

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Note of Issue Filed; Justice Part: Mc Clusky, Hon. James P. (Court Activity)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less