This case was last updated from Richmond County New York Courts on 11/19/2021 at 05:29:06 (UTC).

JOHNSON, SHEREE HAZEL vs. NEW YORK PARTY PEOPLES INC.

Case Summary

On 07/10/2015 JOHNSON, SHEREE HAZEL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against NEW YORK PARTY PEOPLES INC. This case was filed in Richmond County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2015

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHNSON, SHEREE HAZEL

Defendant

NEW YORK PARTY PEOPLES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARDINER & NOLAN

Attorney at GARDINER & NOLAN

457 56Th St

Brooklyn, NY 11220-3408

Defendant Attorney

SCAHILL LAW GROUP, P.C.

Attorney at SCAHILL LAW GROUP, P.C.

1065 Stewart Ave Ste 210

Bethpage, NY 11714-3545

 

Court Documents

ORDER - CERTIFICATION

10/4/16 Conference

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Scahill, F.; Filed: 08/31/2017; Received: 08/31/2017

ORDER - TRANSFER 3/10/17 Conference

ORDER - TRANSFER 3/10/17 Conference; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/10/2017; Received: 03/10/2017

RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Notice to Admit

RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Notice to Admit; Filed By: Scahill, F.; Filed: 01/23/2017; Received: 01/23/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 side view front truck

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 side view front truck; Filed By: Gardiner, W.; Filed: 01/10/2017; Received: 01/10/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 photo 2 closer view front truck

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 photo 2 closer view front truck; Filed By: Gardiner, W.; Filed: 01/10/2017; Received: 01/10/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Photo front truck

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Photo front truck; Filed By: Gardiner, W.; Filed: 01/10/2017; Received: 01/10/2017

NOTICE TO ADMIT

NOTICE TO ADMIT; Filed By: Gardiner, W.; Filed: 01/10/2017; Received: 01/10/2017

STIPULATION - DISCOVERY 12/7/16 Conference

STIPULATION - DISCOVERY 12/7/16 Conference; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/08/2016; Received: 12/08/2016

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY; Filed By: Gardiner, W.; Filed: 10/18/2016; Received: 10/18/2016

ORDER - CERTIFICATION 10/4/16 Conference

ORDER - CERTIFICATION 10/4/16 Conference; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/05/2016; Received: 10/05/2016

STIPULATION - DISCOVERY

STIPULATION - DISCOVERY; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/14/2016; Received: 09/14/2016

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE 6/29/16 Conference

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE 6/29/16 Conference; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/30/2016; Received: 06/30/2016

STIPULATION - DISCOVERY 4/20/16 Conference

STIPULATION - DISCOVERY 4/20/16 Conference; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/21/2016; Received: 04/21/2016

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE 1/20/16 Conference

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE 1/20/16 Conference; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/21/2016; Received: 01/21/2016

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE 8/5/15 Conference

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE 8/5/15 Conference; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/11/2015; Received: 08/11/2015

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Scahill, F.; Filed: 07/10/2015; Received: 07/10/2015

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Scahill, F.; Filed: 07/10/2015; Received: 07/10/2015

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2017
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Settled; Justice Part: Scheduling Judge, Trial Jury Coordinating Part 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Scheduling Judge, Trial Jury Coordinating Part 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Reassignment; Justice Part: Troia, Hon. Charles M. DCM Part 1; Remarks: FROM DCM1, CT, TO JCP8, JM (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Troia, Hon. Charles M. DCM Part 1; Remarks: PTC (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Troia, Hon. Charles M. DCM Part 1; Remarks: PTC (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Troia, Hon. Charles M. DCM Part 1; Remarks: CERT CONF (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Troia, Hon. Charles M. DCM Part 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Troia, Hon. Charles M. DCM Part 1; Remarks: CC (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Troia, Hon. Charles M. DCM Part 1; Remarks: CC (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Troia, Hon. Charles M. DCM Part 1; Remarks: CC (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Troia, Hon. Charles M. DCM Part 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Troia, Hon. Charles M. DCM Part 1; Remarks: PC (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less