This case was last updated from Richmond County New York Courts on 11/19/2021 at 04:06:57 (UTC).

JEEVANANTHAN, GOWSIKA vs. NEW YORK HOTEL TRADES

Case Summary

On 07/09/2015 JEEVANANTHAN, GOWSIKA filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against NEW YORK HOTEL TRADES. This case was filed in Richmond County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Minardo, Hon. Philip G.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2015

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Minardo, Hon. Philip G.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JEEVANANTHAN, GOWSIKA

Defendants

NEW YORK HOTEL TRADES

Gotham Eye Associates

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN J. TRACY, ESQ.

Attorney at JOHN J. TRACY, ESQ.

94 Lincoln Ave

Staten Island, NY 10306-2414

Defendant Attorneys

STRONGIN ROTHMAN & ABRAMS, LLP

Attorney at STRONGIN ROTHMAN & ABRAMS, LLP

80 Pine St Fl 10

New York, NY 10005-1750

Ekblom & Partners, LLP

Attorney at Ekblom & Partners, LLP

850 3Rd Ave Fl 21

New York, NY 10022-7266

Ekblom & Partners, LLC

Attorney at Ekblom & Partners, LLC

850 3Rd Ave

New York, NY 10022-6222

 

Court Documents

ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION

--none--

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)

Consent to Change Attorney

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Ekblom, N.; Filed: 05/16/2017; Received: 05/16/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A Order

EXHIBIT(S) - A Order; Filed By: Ekblom, N.; Filed: 05/16/2017; Received: 05/16/2017

NOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry

NOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry; Filed By: Ekblom, N.; Filed: 05/16/2017; Received: 05/16/2017

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001A)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001A); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/15/2017; Received: 05/15/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service Notice of Settlement of Order

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service Notice of Settlement of Order; Filed By: Ekblom, N.; Filed: 03/22/2017; Received: 03/22/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A Order - exhibit

EXHIBIT(S) - A Order - exhibit; Filed By: Ekblom, N.; Filed: 03/22/2017; Received: 03/22/2017

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED ORDER/COUNTER ORDER Notice of Settlement of Order

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED ORDER/COUNTER ORDER Notice of Settlement of Order; Filed By: Ekblom, N.; Filed: 03/22/2017; Received: 03/22/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001A)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001A); Filed By: Tracy, J.; Filed: 12/07/2016; Received: 12/07/2016

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service by Mail and Electronic Filing ECF

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service by Mail and Electronic Filing ECF; Filed By: Tracy, J.; Filed: 11/29/2016; Received: 11/29/2016

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001A)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001A); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/29/2016; Received: 11/29/2016

ORDER ( PROPOSED )

ORDER ( PROPOSED ); Filed By: Tracy, J.; Filed: 11/22/2016; Received: 11/22/2016

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001A)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001A); Filed By: Tracy, J.; Filed: 10/26/2016; Received: 10/26/2016

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001A)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001A); Filed By: Tracy, J.; Filed: 10/26/2016; Received: 10/26/2016

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY (Motion #001A)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY (Motion #001A); Filed By: Tracy, J.; Filed: 10/26/2016; Received: 10/26/2016

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED (Motion #001)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/24/2016; Received: 10/24/2016

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001A)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001A); Filed By: Tracy, J.; Filed: 10/13/2016; Received: 10/13/2016

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2017
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Justice Part: Minardo, Hon. Philip G. DCM Part 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Minardo, Hon. Philip G. DCM Part 6; Remarks: CC (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Motion-Other; Outcome Type: Granted; Justice Part: Minardo, Hon. Philip G. DCM Part 6M; Remarks: XSFO (Conversion); Motion Seq: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 1; Relief Sought: Attorney - Disqualify/Relieve/Substitute/Withdraw; Submit Date: 11/17/2016; Answer Demanded: No; Status: Decided: 11/17/2016 Granted Before Justice: Minardo, Hon. Philip G.; Decision: Oral; Order Signed Date: 05/09/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Minardo, Hon. Philip G. DCM Part 6; Remarks: CC (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Minardo, Hon. Philip G. DCM Part 6; Remarks: CC (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Minardo, Hon. Philip G. DCM Part 6; Remarks: CC (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Minardo, Hon. Philip G. DCM Part 6; Remarks: CC (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Minardo, Hon. Philip G. DCM Part 6; Remarks: PC (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Minardo, Hon. Philip G. DCM Part 6; Remarks: PC (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less