This case was last updated from Richmond County New York Courts on 11/19/2021 at 06:41:19 (UTC).

ECKER, DOUGLAS vs. CITY OF NEW YORK

Case Summary

On 12/07/2015 ECKER, DOUGLAS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF NEW YORK. This case was filed in Richmond County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Aliotta, Hon. Thomas P.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2015

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Aliotta, Hon. Thomas P.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ECKER, DOUGLAS

Defendant

CITY OF NEW YORK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SACKS & SACKS

Attorney at SACKS & SACKS

150 Broadway Fl 4Th

New York, NY 10038-4381

Sacks and Sacks, LLP

Attorney at Sacks and Sacks, LLP

150 Broadway Fl 4

New York, NY 10038-4346

 

Court Documents

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

Letter to Court Regarding Settlement

STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )

--none--

COURT NOTICE

--none--

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI)

--none--

COURT NOTICE

--none--

COURT NOTICE

--none--

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)

COVID-19 Communications

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY

--none--

ANSWER

--none--

NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Thompson, O.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Doman, D.; Filed: 01/17/2020; Received: 01/17/2020

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/17/2020; Received: 01/17/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001); Filed By: Thompson, O.; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Doman, M.; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) K betw. SCA and Dematteis

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) K betw. SCA and Dematteis; Filed By: Doman, M.; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Doman, M.; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) (Motion #001) Stipulation to Adjourn Motion

STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) (Motion #001) Stipulation to Adjourn Motion; Filed By: Doman, D.; Filed: 09/26/2019; Received: 09/26/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #001) Note of Issue

EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #001) Note of Issue; Filed By: Thompson, O.; Filed: 09/23/2019; Received: 09/23/2019

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Jury Selection-Trial; Justice Part: Green, Hon. Desmond A. Trial Ready Part; Remarks: As per e-mail, this matter settled prior to trialAs per e-mail, this matter settled prior to trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Jury Selection-Trial; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Green, Hon. Desmond A. Trial Ready Part; Remarks: JURY SELECTION, CONT D COVID ADJ (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conference-Settlement; Justice Part: Aliotta, Hon. Thomas P. City Part 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Scheduling Judge, Trial Trial Ready Part; Remarks: JURY SELECTION (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Scheduling Judge, Trial Trial Ready Part

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Reassignment; Justice Part: City Trial Readiness Part,City Part 2; Remarks: SCP/TRP ELIGIBLE (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: City Trial Readiness Part,Settlement Conf/Mediation Part

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: City Trial Readiness Part,City Part 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: City Trial Readiness Part,City Part 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Scarano, Annette Settlement Conf/Mediation Part; Remarks: 930AM ROOM 114, 18 RICHMOND TERRACE (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 08/08/2017
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: City Trial Readiness Part,City Part 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: City Trial Readiness Part,City Part 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: City Trial Readiness Part,City Part 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: City Trial Readiness Part,City Part 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: City Trial Readiness Part,City Part 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: City Trial Readiness Part,City Part 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: City Trial Readiness Part,City Part 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: City Trial Readiness Part,City Part 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: City Trial Readiness Part,City Part 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: City Trial Readiness Part,City Part 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less