This case was last updated from Richmond County New York Courts on 11/19/2021 at 05:07:01 (UTC).

DAVIDS, MIAMONA vs. NIEVES, LUCY

Case Summary

On 05/27/2015 DAVIDS, MIAMONA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against NIEVES, LUCY. This case was filed in Richmond County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Dollard, Hon. Mary Kim. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2015

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Dollard, Hon. Mary Kim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAVIDS, MIAMONA

Defendant

NIEVES, LUCY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Luthmann, Richard Albert

Attorney at Luthmann, Richard Albert

1811 Victory Blvd

Staten Island, NY 10314-3551

 

Court Documents

ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM

ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/16/2016; Received: 06/16/2016

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/05/2015; Received: 11/05/2015

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE; Filed By: Luthmann, R.; Filed: 06/11/2015; Received: 06/11/2015

ANSWER answer and opt out

ANSWER answer and opt out; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/08/2015; Received: 06/08/2015

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED (Motion #001)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/28/2015; Received: 05/28/2015

EXHIBIT(S) - D Ex. D to Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - D Ex. D to Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Luthmann, R.; Filed: 05/27/2015; Received: 05/27/2015

EXHIBIT(S) - C Ex. C to Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - C Ex. C to Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Luthmann, R.; Filed: 05/27/2015; Received: 05/27/2015

EXHIBIT(S) - B Ex. B to Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - B Ex. B to Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Luthmann, R.; Filed: 05/27/2015; Received: 05/27/2015

EXHIBIT(S) - A Ex. A to Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A Ex. A to Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Luthmann, R.; Filed: 05/27/2015; Received: 05/27/2015

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Filed By: Luthmann, R.; Filed: 05/27/2015; Received: 05/27/2015

MEMORANDUM OF LAW

MEMORANDUM OF LAW; Filed By: Luthmann, R.; Filed: 05/27/2015; Received: 05/27/2015

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Notice Letter

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Notice Letter; Filed By: Luthmann, R.; Filed: 05/27/2015; Received: 05/27/2015

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT; Filed By: Luthmann, R.; Filed: 05/27/2015; Received: 05/27/2015

EXHIBIT(S) - A Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Luthmann, R.; Filed: 05/27/2015; Received: 05/27/2015

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT; Filed By: Luthmann, R.; Filed: 05/27/2015; Received: 05/27/2015

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED); Filed By: Luthmann, R.; Filed: 05/27/2015; Received: 05/27/2015

EXHIBIT(S) - D Notice Email to City / DOE

EXHIBIT(S) - D Notice Email to City / DOE; Filed By: Luthmann, R.; Filed: 05/26/2015; Received: 05/26/2015

EXHIBIT(S) - C Nieves Email 3

EXHIBIT(S) - C Nieves Email 3; Filed By: Luthmann, R.; Filed: 05/26/2015; Received: 05/26/2015

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Motion-Other; Outcome Type: Signed; Justice Part: Dollard, Hon. Mary Kim DCM Part 4M; Remarks: XMD (Conversion); Motion Seq: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Motion-Other; Outcome Type: Signed; Justice Part: Dollard, Hon. Mary Kim DCM Part 4M; Remarks: XMD (Conversion); Motion Seq: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Justice Part: Dollard, Hon. Mary Kim DCM Part 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Motion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Dollard, Hon. Mary Kim DCM Part 4M; Remarks: ADM ADJ (Conversion); Motion Seq: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Motion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Dollard, Hon. Mary Kim DCM Part 4M; Remarks: ADM ADJ (Conversion); Motion Seq: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Motion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Dollard, Hon. Mary Kim DCM Part 4M; Remarks: ADM ADJ (Conversion); Motion Seq: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Motion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Dollard, Hon. Mary Kim DCM Part 4M; Remarks: ADM ADJ (Conversion); Motion Seq: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Motion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Dollard, Hon. Mary Kim DCM Part 4M; Motion Seq: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Motion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Dollard, Hon. Mary Kim DCM Part 4M; Motion Seq: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Motion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Dollard, Hon. Mary Kim DCM Part 4M; Motion Seq: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Motion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Dollard, Hon. Mary Kim DCM Part 4M; Motion Seq: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Motion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Dollard, Hon. Mary Kim DCM Part 4M; Motion Seq: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Motion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Dollard, Hon. Mary Kim DCM Part 4M; Motion Seq: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 2; Filed By: DEFENDANT; Relief Sought: Change Venue; Submit Date: 06/10/2016; Answer Demanded: No; Status: Decided: 06/10/2016 Signed Before Justice: Dollard, Hon. Mary Kim; Decision: Oral; Order Signed Date: 06/10/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2015
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Motion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Dollard, Hon. Mary Kim DCM Part 4M; Motion Seq: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2015
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 1; Relief Sought: Injunction/Restraining Order; Submit Date: 06/10/2016; Answer Demanded: No; Status: Decided: 06/10/2016 Signed Before Justice: Dollard, Hon. Mary Kim; Decision: Oral; Order Signed Date: 06/10/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less