This case was last updated from Richmond County New York Courts on 11/19/2021 at 03:55:57 (UTC).

DAREVSKAYA, VALENTINA vs. AMMIRATI, FRANK

Case Summary

On 04/09/2015 DAREVSKAYA, VALENTINA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against AMMIRATI, FRANK. This case was filed in Richmond County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2015

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAREVSKAYA, VALENTINA

Defendant

AMMIRATI, FRANK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Prakhin, Yuriy

Attorney at Prakhin, Yuriy

1883 86Th St Fl 2

Brooklyn, NY 11214-3108

Defendant Attorneys

CONNORS & CONNORS, P.C.

Attorney at CONNORS & CONNORS, P.C.

766 Castleton Ave

Staten Island, NY 10310-1800

Law Offices of Terrence F. Kuhn

Attorney at Law Offices of Terrence F. Kuhn

100 Williams Suite 920

New York, NY 10038

GOETZ SCHENKER BLEE & WIEDERHORN

Attorney at GOETZ SCHENKER BLEE & WIEDERHORN

101 Greenwich St Fl 20

New York, NY 10006-1899

Lewis Johs Avallone Aviles, LLP

Attorney at Lewis Johs Avallone Aviles, LLP

61 Broadway Suite 2000

New York, NY 10006

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance with prejudice

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance with prejudice; Filed By: Cowen, G.; Filed: 08/23/2017; Received: 08/23/2017

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Prakhin, Y.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002) Mot Seq #002

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002) Mot Seq #002; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/24/2017; Received: 02/24/2017

ORDER - TRANSFER 2/24/17 Conference

ORDER - TRANSFER 2/24/17 Conference; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/24/2017; Received: 02/24/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002); Filed By: Cowen, G.; Filed: 02/10/2017; Received: 02/10/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #002) EX 2 - NOTE OF ISSUE

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #002) EX 2 - NOTE OF ISSUE; Filed By: Cowen, G.; Filed: 02/10/2017; Received: 02/10/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #002) E-Filing Document List - Second Action

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #002) E-Filing Document List - Second Action; Filed By: Cowen, G.; Filed: 02/10/2017; Received: 02/10/2017

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Cowen, G.; Filed: 02/10/2017; Received: 02/10/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #002) Correspondence from Associate Court Clerk dated 1.27.17

EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #002) Correspondence from Associate Court Clerk dated 1.27.17; Filed By: Metzger, D.; Filed: 02/06/2017; Received: 02/06/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #002) Request for Preliminary Conference

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #002) Request for Preliminary Conference; Filed By: Metzger, D.; Filed: 02/06/2017; Received: 02/06/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #002) Notice of Entry

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #002) Notice of Entry; Filed By: Metzger, D.; Filed: 02/06/2017; Received: 02/06/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #002) Order dated 5.13.16

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #002) Order dated 5.13.16; Filed By: Metzger, D.; Filed: 02/06/2017; Received: 02/06/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #002) Order dated 4.4.16

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #002) Order dated 4.4.16; Filed By: Metzger, D.; Filed: 02/06/2017; Received: 02/06/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) Discovery Demands

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) Discovery Demands; Filed By: Metzger, D.; Filed: 02/06/2017; Received: 02/06/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) Answer to Amended Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) Answer to Amended Complaint; Filed By: Metzger, D.; Filed: 02/06/2017; Received: 02/06/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Pages from plaintiff's 11.25.15 EBT transcript

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Pages from plaintiff's 11.25.15 EBT transcript; Filed By: Metzger, D.; Filed: 02/06/2017; Received: 02/06/2017

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Metzger, D.; Filed: 02/06/2017; Received: 02/06/2017

NOTICE OF ENTRY Order with Notice of Entry

NOTICE OF ENTRY Order with Notice of Entry; Filed By: Veras, M.; Filed: 01/06/2017; Received: 01/06/2017

64 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2017
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Settled; Justice Part: Scheduling Judge, Trial Jury Coordinating Part 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Scheduling Judge, Trial Jury Coordinating Part 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Reassignment; Justice Part: Troia, Hon. Charles M. DCM Part 1; Remarks: FROM DCM1, CT, TO JCP8, JM (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Motion-Other; Outcome Type: Signed; Justice Part: Troia, Hon. Charles M. DCM Part 1M; Remarks: XMD (Conversion); Motion Seq: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 2; Relief Sought: Join for Trial; Submit Date: 02/24/2017; Answer Demanded: No; Status: Decided: 02/24/2017 Signed Before Justice: Troia, Hon. Charles M.; Decision: Memorandum; Order Signed Date: 02/24/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Troia, Hon. Charles M. DCM Part 1; Remarks: PTC (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Troia, Hon. Charles M. DCM Part 1; Remarks: PTC (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Motion-Other; Outcome Type: Signed; Justice Part: Troia, Hon. Charles M. DCM Part 1M; Remarks: XMG (Conversion); Motion Seq: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Troia, Hon. Charles M. DCM Part 1; Remarks: PTC (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Motion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Troia, Hon. Charles M. DCM Part 1M; Motion Seq: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Troia, Hon. Charles M. DCM Part 1; Remarks: CC (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Troia, Hon. Charles M. DCM Part 1; Remarks: CC (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 11:00 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Troia, Hon. Charles M. DCM Part 1; Remarks: @11:00A (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Troia, Hon. Charles M. DCM Part 1; Remarks: CC (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Troia, Hon. Charles M. DCM Part 1; Remarks: CC (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Troia, Hon. Charles M. DCM Part 1; Remarks: CC (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Troia, Hon. Charles M. DCM Part 1; Remarks: CC (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Troia, Hon. Charles M. DCM Part 1; Remarks: CC (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Troia, Hon. Charles M. DCM Part 1; Remarks: CC (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Troia, Hon. Charles M. DCM Part 1; Remarks: PC (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less