This case was last updated from Jefferson County New York Courts on 04/02/2023 at 06:18:35 (UTC).

PATRICIA L GIBBONS vs. DAVID P GIBBONS

Case Summary

On 12/24/2015 PATRICIA L GIBBONS filed an Other lawsuit against DAVID P GIBBONS. This case was filed in Jefferson County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Jefferson, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Mc Clusky, Hon. James P.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2015

  • Filing Date:

    12/24/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Jefferson, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Mc Clusky, Hon. James P.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PATRICIA L GIBBONS

Defendant

DAVID P GIBBONS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Hasseler, Lawrence Donald

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

06/28/2017

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Decided; Justice Part: Mc Clusky, Hon. James P. (Court Activity)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2017

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Post-Note Post Judgment Application; Justice Part: Mc Clusky, Hon. James P. (Court Activity)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2017

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Post-Note Post Judgment Application; Justice Part: Mc Clusky, Hon. James P. (Court Activity)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2016

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Post-Settled Before Trial; Justice Part: Mc Clusky, Hon. James P. (Court Activity)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2016

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:00 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Trial Set For; Justice Part: Mc Clusky, Hon. James P. (Trial Part)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2016

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Trial Ended; Justice Part: Mc Clusky, Hon. James P. (Trial Part)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/23/2016

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Note of Issue Filed; Justice Part: Mc Clusky, Hon. James P. (Court Activity)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/29/2016

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Trial-Non-Jury; Outcome Type: Pre Trial Conference; Justice Part: Mc Clusky, Hon. James P. (Pre-Trial Conference)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2016

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:00 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Preliminary; Outcome Type: Preliminary Conference; Justice Part: Mc Clusky, Hon. James P. (Prelim. Conference)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2016

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Preliminary; Outcome Type: Preliminary Conference; Justice Part: Mc Clusky, Hon. James P. (Prelim. Conference)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2016

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 01:00 PM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Preliminary; Outcome Type: Preliminary Conference; Justice Part: Mc Clusky, Hon. James P. (Prelim. Conference)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2016

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Preliminary; Outcome Type: Preliminary Conference; Justice Part: Mc Clusky, Hon. James P. (Prelim. Conference)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less