This case was last updated from Putnam County New York Courts on 05/29/2023 at 16:41:55 (UTC).

GMAC MORTGAGE, LLC. vs. JORDAN, KEITH

Case Summary

On 01/03/2013 GMAC MORTGAGE, LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against JORDAN, KEITH. This case was filed in Putnam County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Columbia, New York. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2012

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Putnam, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GMAC MORTGAGE, LLC.

Defendants

JORDAN, KEITH

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FEIN, SUCH & CRANE, LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

03/13/2015

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conference-Foreclosure Settlement; Outcome Type: Settled: Loan Modification - Unrepresented; Justice Part: Set. Part (Putnam), Foreclosure Foreclosure Set. Part (Putnam); Remarks: Supreme Trial, LOAN MOD (Conversion)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/21/2015

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Foreclosure Settlement; Outcome Type: Continued; Justice Part: Set. Part (Putnam), Foreclosure Foreclosure Set. Part (Putnam); Remarks: Supreme Trial, 9:30 CNF (Conversion)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/12/2014

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 01:45 PM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Foreclosure Settlement; Outcome Type: Continued; Justice Part: Set. Part (Putnam), Foreclosure Foreclosure Set. Part (Putnam); Remarks: Supreme Trial, 1:45 CNF (Conversion)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/08/2014

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Foreclosure Settlement; Outcome Type: Continued; Justice Part: Set. Part (Putnam), Foreclosure Foreclosure Set. Part (Putnam); Remarks: Supreme Trial, 9:30 CNF (Conversion)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/13/2014

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Foreclosure Settlement; Outcome Type: Continued; Justice Part: Set. Part (Putnam), Foreclosure Foreclosure Set. Part (Putnam); Remarks: Supreme Trial, 9:30 DI (Conversion)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/26/2014

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Foreclosure Settlement; Outcome Type: Continued; Justice Part: Set. Part (Putnam), Foreclosure Foreclosure Set. Part (Putnam); Remarks: Supreme Trial, 9:30 DISMISSAL (Conversion)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/26/2014

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Foreclosure Settlement; Justice Part: Set. Part (Putnam), Foreclosure Foreclosure Set. Part (Putnam); Remarks: Supreme Trial, 9:30 DC, 45 DAY STAY (Conversion)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2013

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Foreclosure Settlement; Justice Part: Set. Part (Putnam), Foreclosure Foreclosure Set. Part (Putnam); Remarks: Supreme Trial, 9:30 CM (Conversion)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2013

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Foreclosure Settlement; Outcome Type: Continued; Justice Part: Set. Part (Putnam), Foreclosure Foreclosure Set. Part (Putnam); Remarks: Supreme Trial, 9:30 CM (Conversion)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2013

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Foreclosure Settlement; Outcome Type: Continued; Justice Part: Set. Part (Putnam), Foreclosure Foreclosure Set. Part (Putnam); Remarks: Supreme Initial (first time on), 10:30AM CR209 CNF (Conversion)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less