This case was last updated from Putnam County New York Courts on 05/28/2023 at 03:49:36 (UTC).

SOTO,DIANE vs. HAIGHT,GEORGE

Case Summary

On 10/05/2012 SOTO,DIANE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HAIGHT,GEORGE. This case was filed in Putnam County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Putnam, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Lubell, Hon. Lewis Jay. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2012

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Putnam, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Lubell, Hon. Lewis Jay

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOTO,DIANE

Defendant

HAIGHT,GEORGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LESCH & LESCH, P.C.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

01/06/2014

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Justice Part: Lubell, Hon. Lewis Jay Lewis J. Lubell; Remarks: STIP FLD, SETTLED PER LETTER (Conversion)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2013

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Lubell, Hon. Lewis Jay Lewis J. Lubell

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/07/2013

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Status; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Lubell, Hon. Lewis Jay Lewis J. Lubell; Remarks: Supreme Trial, 9:30 SC (Conversion)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/30/2013

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Status; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Lubell, Hon. Lewis Jay Lewis J. Lubell; Remarks: Supreme Trial, 9:30 SC (Conversion)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/29/2013

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Status; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Lubell, Hon. Lewis Jay Lewis J. Lubell; Remarks: Supreme Trial, CNF 9:30AM CR401, 5/13 (Conversion)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/13/2013

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Status; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Lubell, Hon. Lewis Jay Lewis J. Lubell; Remarks: Supreme Trial, CNF 9:30AM CR401, 2/11 (Conversion)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/11/2013

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Compliance; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Lubell, Hon. Lewis Jay Lewis J. Lubell; Remarks: Supreme Trial, CC 9:30AM CR401, 12/3 (Conversion)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/03/2012

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Preliminary; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Lubell, Hon. Lewis Jay Lewis J. Lubell; Remarks: Supreme Trial, PC 9:30AM CR401, 11/26 (Conversion)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/26/2012

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Status; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Lubell, Hon. Lewis Jay Lewis J. Lubell; Remarks: Supreme Initial (first time on), PC 9:30AM CR401 (Conversion)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less