This case was last updated from Putnam County New York Courts on 04/05/2023 at 07:19:58 (UTC).

SCLAFANI PETROLEUM vs. SCLAFANI,JEROME

Case Summary

On 08/06/2015 SCLAFANI PETROLEUM filed an Other lawsuit against SCLAFANI,JEROME. This case was filed in Putnam County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Putnam, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Capone, Hon. Gina C.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2015

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Putnam, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Capone, Hon. Gina C.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SCLAFANI PETROLEUM

Defendants

SCLAFANI,JEROME

LAWRENCE ROVETTO

JEROME & MAUREEN SCLAFANI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATTORNEY GENERAL,N.Y.S.

Defendant Attorney

Catania, Mahon & Rider, PLLC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

04/15/2021

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conference-Unknown; Outcome Type: Discontinued; Justice Part: Capone, Hon. Gina C.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2021

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 03:00 PM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Status; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Capone, Hon. Gina C.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2021

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 12:00 PM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Status; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Capone, Hon. Gina C.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/16/2021

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 03:00 PM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Status; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Capone, Hon. Gina C.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2021

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 12:00 PM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Status; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Capone, Hon. Gina C.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2021

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Status; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Capone, Hon. Gina C.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/18/2020

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Status; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Capone, Hon. Gina C.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2020

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:00 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Unknown; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Capone, Hon. Gina C.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/29/2020

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Unknown; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Capone, Hon. Gina C.; Remarks: no appearances

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/29/2020

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 11:00 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Status; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Capone, Hon. Gina C.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
31 More Docket Entries
02/22/2016

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Reitz, Hon. James F. James F. Reitz (Trial); Remarks: 9:30 STATUS CONF (Conversion)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/18/2015

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Status; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Lubell, Hon. Lewis Jay Lewis J. Lubell; Remarks: Supreme Trial, 9:30 ALL PURPOSE, SEQ #2 (Conversion)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/18/2015

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Motion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Lubell, Hon. Lewis Jay Lewis J. Lubell (Motions); Remarks: 9:30 CNF (Conversion); Motion Seq: 2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2015

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Motion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Lubell, Hon. Lewis Jay Lewis J. Lubell (Motions); Motion Seq: 2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2015

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Motion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Lubell, Hon. Lewis Jay Lewis J. Lubell (Motions); Remarks: SUBM ONLY/NO APP (Conversion); Motion Seq: 2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2015

DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 2; Submit Date: 07/08/2016; Answer Demanded: No; Status: Decided: 07/08/2016 Denied Before Justice: Reitz, Hon. James F.; Decision: Memorandum; Order Signed Date: 07/08/2016

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2015

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Status; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Lubell, Hon. Lewis Jay Lewis J. Lubell; Remarks: Supreme Trial, 10:30 ALL PURPOSE, OSC VACATED (Conversion)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2015

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Motion-Other; Outcome Type: Decided; Justice Part: Lubell, Hon. Lewis Jay Lewis J. Lubell (Motions); Motion Seq: 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2015

DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 1; Submit Date: 09/25/2015; Answer Demanded: No; Status: Decided: 09/25/2015 Decided Before Justice: Lubell, Hon. Lewis Jay; Decision: Oral; Order Signed Date: 09/25/2015

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2015

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:30 PM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Status; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Grossman, Hon. Victor G. Victor G. Grossman; Remarks: Supreme Initial (first time on), 2:30 CONFERENCE, 9/25 OSC APPEARANCE (Conversion)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less