This case was last updated from Jefferson County New York Courts on 04/01/2023 at 13:40:50 (UTC).

Yehle, John L. vs. Rich, Jon T., Jr.

Case Summary

On 06/17/2015 Yehle, John L filed an Other lawsuit against Rich, Jon T , Jr. This case was filed in Jefferson County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Jefferson, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Mc Clusky, Hon. James P.. The case status is Not Yet Classified.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2015

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Yet Classified

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Jefferson, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Mc Clusky, Hon. James P.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Yehle, John L.

Defendant

Rich, Jon T., Jr.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Longstreet, Michael J.

Defendant Attorneys

ROSE, DANIEL

COSTELLO, COONEY & FEARON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

05/12/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Motion-Notice of Motion; Outcome Type: Granted; Justice Part: Mc Clusky, Hon. James P. All Purpose; Remarks: Appearance; Motion Seq: 8

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2022

DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 8; Relief Sought: Attorney - Disqualify/Relieve/Substitute/Withdraw; Submit Date: 05/12/2022; Answer Demanded: No; Status: Decided: 05/12/2022 Granted Before Justice: Mc Clusky, Hon. James P.; Decision: Short Form Order; Order Signed Date: 05/16/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/19/2021

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Motion-Notice of Motion; Outcome Type: Decision Reserved; Justice Part: Mc Clusky, Hon. James P. All Purpose; Remarks: Virtual; Motion Seq: 7

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2021

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Motion-Notice of Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Mc Clusky, Hon. James P. All Purpose; Remarks: Virtual; Motion Seq: 7

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2021

DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 7; Submit Date: 08/19/2021; Answer Demanded: No; Status: Decided: 08/25/2021 Denied Before Justice: Mc Clusky, Hon. James P.; Decision: Short Form Order; Order Signed Date: 08/25/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/21/2021

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:30 PM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Compliance; Justice Part: Mc Clusky, Hon. James P. All Purpose; Remarks: CancelledCancelled

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2019

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Motion-Notice of Motion; Outcome Type: Denied; Justice Part: Mc Clusky, Hon. James P. All Purpose; Motion Seq: 6

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2019

DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 6; Relief Sought: Appoint - Temporary/Permanent Receiver; Submit Date: 10/11/2019; Answer Demanded: No; Status: Decided: 10/11/2019 Denied Before Justice: Mc Clusky, Hon. James P.; Decision: Short Form Order; Order Signed Date: 10/11/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2019

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Motion-Cross-Motion; Outcome Type: Decision Reserved; Justice Part: Mc Clusky, Hon. James P. All Purpose; Motion Seq: 5

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2019

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Motion-Notice of Motion; Outcome Type: Decision Reserved; Justice Part: Mc Clusky, Hon. James P. All Purpose; Motion Seq: 4

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
03/02/2018

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Preliminary; Outcome Type: Preliminary Conference; Justice Part: Mc Clusky, Hon. James P. (Prelim. Conference)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/09/2018

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 01:00 PM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Preliminary; Outcome Type: Preliminary Conference; Justice Part: Mc Clusky, Hon. James P. (Prelim. Conference)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2016

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Motion-Other; Outcome Type: Decided; Justice Part: Mc Clusky, Hon. James P. (Motion Part); Motion Seq: 2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2016

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Motion-Other; Outcome Type: Return Date; Justice Part: Mc Clusky, Hon. James P. (Motion Part); Motion Seq: 2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/19/2016

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Motion-Other; Outcome Type: Motion Filed; Justice Part: Mc Clusky, Hon. James P. (Motion Part); Motion Seq: 2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/19/2016

DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 2; Submit Date: 09/12/2016; Answer Demanded: No; Status: Decided: 09/12/2016 Decided Before Justice: Mc Clusky, Hon. James P.; Order Signed Date: 09/12/2016

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/03/2015

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Motion-Other; Outcome Type: Decided; Justice Part: Mc Clusky, Hon. James P. (Motion Part); Motion Seq: 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/03/2015

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Motion-Other; Outcome Type: Return Date; Justice Part: Mc Clusky, Hon. James P. (Motion Part); Motion Seq: 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/17/2015

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Motion-Other; Outcome Type: Motion Filed; Justice Part: Mc Clusky, Hon. James P. (Motion Part); Motion Seq: 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/17/2015

DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 1; Submit Date: 09/03/2015; Answer Demanded: No; Status: Decided: 09/03/2015 Decided Before Justice: Mc Clusky, Hon. James P.; Order Signed Date: 09/03/2015

[+] Read More [-] Read Less