This case was last updated from Richmond County New York Courts on 11/19/2021 at 06:39:17 (UTC).

ALMENAS, SHANA vs. LUNIKA CARS LLC,

Case Summary

On 10/23/2015 ALMENAS, SHANA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LUNIKA CARS LLC,. This case was filed in Richmond County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2015

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALMENAS, SHANA

Defendant

LUNIKA CARS LLC,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KUHARSKI, LEVITZ & GIOVINAZZO, ESQS.

Attorney at KUHARSKI, LEVITZ & GIOVINAZZO, ESQS.

176 Hart Blvd

Staten Island, NY 10301-3444

Defendant Attorneys

BAKER, MCEVOY & MOSKOVITS, P.C.

Attorney at BAKER, MCEVOY & MOSKOVITS, P.C.

1 Metrotech Ctr

Brooklyn, NY 11201-3948

MORRIS, DUFFY, ALONSO & FALEY

Attorney at MORRIS, DUFFY, ALONSO & FALEY

2 Rector St Fl 22

New York, NY 10006-1839

KAY & GRAY ESQS

Attorney at KAY & GRAY ESQS

875 Merrick Ave

Westbury, NY 11590-6603

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Benjamin, D. - filed by LAW OFFICE OF NICOLE LESPERANCE; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Benjamin, D. - filed by LAW OFFICE OF NICOLE LESPERANCE; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Levitz, L. - filed by Kuharski, Levitz, Giovinazzo; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Levitz, L. - filed by Kuharski, Levitz, Giovinazzo; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Benjamin, D. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 06/09/2017; Received: 06/09/2017

STIPULATION - OTHER Stipulation to Adjourn Trial

STIPULATION - OTHER Stipulation to Adjourn Trial; Filed By: Benjamin, D. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 06/09/2017; Received: 06/09/2017

ORDER - PRE-TRIAL

ORDER - PRE-TRIAL; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/03/2016; Received: 10/03/2016

ORDER - CERTIFICATION

ORDER - CERTIFICATION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/27/2016; Received: 09/27/2016

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY; Filed By: Levitz, L.; Filed: 08/24/2016; Received: 08/24/2016

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/14/2016; Received: 07/14/2016

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/31/2016; Received: 03/31/2016

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/20/2016; Received: 01/20/2016

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/01/2015; Received: 12/01/2015

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Levitz, L.; Filed: 10/23/2015; Received: 10/23/2015

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Moskovits, R. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 10/22/2015; Received: 10/22/2015

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) AND DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) AND DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Moskovits, R. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 10/22/2015; Received: 10/22/2015

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Gitter, W. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 10/21/2015; Received: 10/21/2015

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Gitter, W. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 10/21/2015; Received: 10/21/2015

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Settled; Justice Part: Scheduling Judge, Trial Jury Coordinating Part 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Scheduling Judge, Trial Jury Coordinating Part 8; Remarks: D/S (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Scheduling Judge, Trial Jury Coordinating Part 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Scheduling Judge, Trial Jury Coordinating Part 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Reassignment; Justice Part: Dollard, Hon. Mary Kim DCM Part 4; Remarks: XFER FROM DCM4 KD, XFER TO JCP8 (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Dollard, Hon. Mary Kim DCM Part 4; Remarks: CC (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Dollard, Hon. Mary Kim DCM Part 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Dollard, Hon. Mary Kim DCM Part 4; Remarks: CC (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Dollard, Hon. Mary Kim DCM Part 4; Remarks: CC (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Dollard, Hon. Mary Kim DCM Part 4; Remarks: PC (Conversion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less