This case was last updated from Erie County Courts on 10/30/2021 at 21:14:58 (UTC).

SWEAT, RACHEL vs. HUDSON, ANDRAUS D

Case Summary

On 08/25/2016 SWEAT, RACHEL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HUDSON, ANDRAUS D. This case was filed in Erie County Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Montour, Hon. Mark A.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2016

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Erie, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Montour, Hon. Mark A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SWEAT, RACHEL

Defendant

HUDSON, ANDRAUS D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN J FROMEN, ATTORNEYS AT LAW, P.C.

Defendant Attorney

RUPP BAASE PFALZGRAF CUNNINGHAM LLC

 

Court Documents

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION

--none--

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

Good Faith Letter

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

--none--

NOTICE OF MOTION

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

Summons and Complaint

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

--none--

ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

Answer

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Status; Outcome Type: Settled; Justice Part: Montour, Hon. Mark A. Part 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 11:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Status; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Montour, Hon. Mark A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 11:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Status; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Montour, Hon. Mark A. Part 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:00 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Status; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Montour, Hon. Mark A. Part 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Status; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Montour, Hon. Mark A. Part 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:00 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Status; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Montour, Hon. Mark A. Part 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 11:00 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Status; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Montour, Hon. Mark A. Part 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Preliminary; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Montour, Hon. Mark A. ADR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Settlement; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Montour, Hon. Mark A. Part 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Preliminary; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Montour, Hon. Mark A. ADR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2018
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:30 PM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Status; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Montour, Hon. Mark A. Part 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 11:00 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Status; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Montour, Hon. Mark A. Part 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:00 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Status; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Montour, Hon. Mark A. Part 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:30 PM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Status; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Montour, Hon. Mark A. Part 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 04:00 PM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Status; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Montour, Hon. Mark A. Part 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 11:00 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Compliance; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Montour, Hon. Mark A. Part 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conference-Preliminary; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Montour, Hon. Mark A. Part 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Court Date Purpose: Motion-Other; Outcome Type: Motion Filed; Justice Part: Drury, Hon. Timothy J. Timothy J. Drury (Motion); Motion Seq: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Court Date Purpose: Motion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Drury, Hon. Timothy J. Timothy J. Drury (Motion); Motion Seq: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 1; Filed By: DEFENDANT; Relief Sought: Discovery; Submit Date: 10/24/2016; Answer Demanded: No; Status: Decided: 10/24/2016 Withdrawn Before Justice: Drury, Hon. Timothy J.; Decision: Oral

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less