This case was last updated from Erie County Courts on 10/30/2021 at 23:45:25 (UTC).

Lipinoga, David et al vs. Williamsville Central School District et al

Case Summary

On 01/17/2018 Lipinoga, David filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Williamsville Central School District. This case was filed in Erie County Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Furlong, Hon. Daniel. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Erie, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Furlong, Hon. Daniel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lipinoga, David et al

Defendant

Williamsville Central School District et al

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STAMM LAW FIRM

Attorney at STAMM LAW FIRM

1127 Wehrle Drive, Suite 100

Williamsville, NY 14221-7700

Towey, Brian Kevin

Attorney at Towey, Brian Kevin

70 Niagara St Ste 107

Buffalo, NY 14202-3407

 

Court Documents

ORDER - INFANT COMPROMISE

--none--

COMPLAINT

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

Plaintiffs Verified BOP

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

Summons & Complaint

NOTICE OF MOTION

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

Defendant Chadalawada Answer

EXHIBIT(S)

Plaintiffs' Second Notice to Produce to Williamsville Central School District

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

--none--

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conference-Compliance; Outcome Type: Settled; Justice Part: Furlong, Hon. Daniel Part 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:00 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Compliance; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Furlong, Hon. Daniel Part 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Compliance; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Furlong, Hon. Daniel Part 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Settlement; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Furlong, Hon. Daniel Part 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Compliance; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: O'Donnell, Hon. John F. Part 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 11:00 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Compliance; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: O'Donnell, Hon. John F.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:00 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Compliance; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: O'Donnell, Hon. John F.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Compliance; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: O'Donnell, Hon. John F.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:00 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Compliance; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: O'Donnell, Hon. John F.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:00 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Compliance; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: O'Donnell, Hon. John F.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Compliance; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: O'Donnell, Hon. John F.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Motion-Notice of Motion; Outcome Type: Granted to the Extent of the Order; Justice Part: O'Donnell, Hon. John F. Part 21; Motion Seq: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Motion-Cross-Motion; Outcome Type: Granted to the Extent of the Order; Justice Part: O'Donnell, Hon. John F. Part 21; Motion Seq: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 2; Filed By: DEFENDANT; Relief Sought: Protective Order; Submit Date: 02/26/2019; Answer Demanded: No; Status: Decided: 02/26/2019 Granted to the Extent of the Order Before Justice: O'Donnell, Hon. John F.; Decision: Long Form Order; Order Signed Date: 02/26/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 1; Relief Sought: Compel; Submit Date: 02/26/2019; Answer Demanded: No; Status: Decided: 02/26/2019 Granted to the Extent of the Order Before Justice: O'Donnell, Hon. John F.; Decision: Long Form Order; Order Signed Date: 02/26/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Compliance; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: O'Donnell, Hon. John F.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Compliance; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: O'Donnell, Hon. John F.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Preliminary; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: O'Donnell, Hon. John F.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 11:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Preliminary; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: O'Donnell, Hon. John F.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less