This case was last updated from Erie County Courts on 10/30/2021 at 23:41:08 (UTC).

GURUNG, SOM vs. GURUNG, SUKBAHADUR

Case Summary

On 07/26/2016 GURUNG, SOM filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GURUNG, SUKBAHADUR. This case was filed in Erie County Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Ogden, Hon. E Jeannette. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2016

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Erie, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Ogden, Hon. E Jeannette

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GURUNG, SOM

Defendant

GURUNG, SUKBAHADUR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Adams, Hanson, Rego & Kaplan

Attorney at Adams, Hanson, Rego & Kaplan

20 Lawrence Bell Dr Ste 300

Williamsville, NY 14221-7090

Hagelin Spencer, LLC

Attorney at Hagelin Spencer, LLC

135 Delaware Ave. Suite 200

Buffalo, NY 14202

HAGELIN KENT LLC

Attorney at HAGELIN KENT LLC

135 Delaware Ave Ste 200

Buffalo, NY 142022410

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF MOTION

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

Disbursement Invoices

EXHIBIT(S)

Pleadings Action #2

NOTICE OF MOTION

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

Report of Dr. Finnegan

EXHIBIT(S)

Good Faith #1

ORDER ( PROPOSED )

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

Disbursement Invoices

EXHIBIT(S)

Answer of deft, Reed

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 11:00 AM; Court Date Purpose: Hearing-Infant Compromise; Outcome Type: Closed; Justice Part: Ogden, Hon. E Jeannette Part 35

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Court Date Purpose: Hearing-Infant Compromise; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Ogden, Hon. E Jeannette Part 35

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Court Date Purpose: Hearing-Infant Compromise; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Ogden, Hon. E Jeannette Part 35

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Court Date Purpose: Motion-Notice of Motion; Outcome Type: Closed; Justice Part: Ogden, Hon. E Jeannette Part 35; Motion Seq: 5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 5; Relief Sought: Compromise; Submit Date: 05/08/2018; Answer Demanded: No; Status: Decided: 05/08/2018 Granted Before Justice: Ogden, Hon. E Jeannette; Decision: Long Form Order; Order Signed Date: 05/08/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Compliance; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Ogden, Hon. E Jeannette Part 35

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Motion-Notice of Motion; Outcome Type: Settled; Justice Part: Ogden, Hon. E Jeannette Part 35; Motion Seq: 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Compliance; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Ogden, Hon. E Jeannette Part 35

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 4; Filed By: DEFENDANT; Relief Sought: Consolidate; Submit Date: 10/24/2017; Answer Demanded: No; Status: Decided: 10/24/2017 Settled Before Justice: Ogden, Hon. E Jeannette

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 11:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Compliance; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Ogden, Hon. E Jeannette Part 35

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/11/2017
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Motion-Other; Outcome Type: Motion Filed; Justice Part: Ogden, Hon. E Jeannette Part 35; Motion Seq: 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 3; Filed By: DEFENDANT; Relief Sought: Preclude; Submit Date: 04/11/2017; Answer Demanded: No; Status: Decided: 04/11/2017 Granted Before Justice: Ogden, Hon. E Jeannette; Decision: Oral; Order Signed Date: 05/05/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Motion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Ogden, Hon. E Jeannette Part 35; Motion Seq: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:00 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Compliance; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Ogden, Hon. E Jeannette Part 35

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 2; Filed By: DEFENDANT; Relief Sought: Judgment - Summary; Submit Date: 06/20/2017; Answer Demanded: No; Status: Decided: 06/20/2017 Withdrawn Before Justice: Ogden, Hon. E Jeannette; Decision: Oral

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Compliance; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Ogden, Hon. E Jeannette Part 35

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 11:00 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Compliance; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Ogden, Hon. E Jeannette Part 35

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Motion-Other; Outcome Type: Motion Filed; Justice Part: Ogden, Hon. E Jeannette Part 35; Motion Seq: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Motion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Ogden, Hon. E Jeannette Part 35; Motion Seq: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 1; Relief Sought: Dismiss Complaint; Submit Date: 11/09/2016; Answer Demanded: No; Status: Decided: 11/09/2016 Withdrawn Before Justice: Ogden, Hon. E Jeannette; Decision: Memorandum

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less