This case was last updated from Putnam County New York Courts on 05/09/2023 at 09:23:49 (UTC).

PETRO INC vs. VINCI, NICHOLAS

Case Summary

On 06/13/2019 PETRO INC filed an Other lawsuit against VINCI, NICHOLAS. This case was filed in Putnam County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Putnam, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Zugibe, Hon. Thomas P.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Putnam, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Zugibe, Hon. Thomas P.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PETRO INC

Defendant

VINCI, NICHOLAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Flynn, Gerald W.

MULLOOLY, JEFFREY, ROONEY & FLYNN, LLP

Sheerin, John Joseph

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 01/04/2019; Received: 01/04/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 01/04/2019; Received: 01/04/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sheerin, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 01/22/2019; Received: 01/22/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Flynn, G.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

ANSWER PROPOSED ANSWER TO CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION

ANSWER PROPOSED ANSWER TO CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/11/2019; Received: 06/11/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/11/2019; Received: 06/11/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/11/2019; Received: 06/11/2019

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/11/2019; Received: 06/13/2019

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/11/2019; Received: 06/13/2019

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

--none--

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

--none--

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

06/13/2019

DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 1; Filed By: DEFENDANT; Relief Sought: Vacate - Decision/Order/Judgment/Award; Submit Date: 06/17/2019; Answer Demanded: No; Status: Decided: 06/17/2019 Declined to Sign Before Justice: Zugibe, Hon. Thomas P.; Decision: Short Form Order; Order Signed Date: 06/17/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less