This case was last updated from Jefferson County New York Courts on 04/30/2023 at 04:07:50 (UTC).

Community Bank, National Association vs. Woods, Eric et al

Case Summary

On 07/27/2022 Community Bank, National Association filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Woods, Eric. This case was filed in Jefferson County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Jefferson, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Mc Clusky, Hon. James P.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********1274

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Jefferson, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Mc Clusky, Hon. James P.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Community Bank, National Association

Defendants

Woods, Eric et al

Woods, Eric

Woods, Shannon M

SEFCU

Doe, John

Doe, Jane

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MORGAN & ASSOCIATES, PLLC

Morgan, Michael Anthony

 

Court Documents

FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM

FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM; Filed By: Morgan, M.; Filed: 11/07/2022; Received: 11/07/2022

REFEREE REPORT OF SALE

REFEREE REPORT OF SALE; Filed By: Morgan, M.; Filed: 11/07/2022; Received: 11/07/2022

AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION; Filed By: Morgan, M.; Filed: 11/07/2022; Received: 11/07/2022

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Posting

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Posting; Filed By: Morgan, M.; Filed: 11/07/2022; Received: 11/07/2022

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Posting

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Posting; Filed By: Morgan, M.; Filed: 11/07/2022; Received: 11/07/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Morgan, M.; Filed: 08/30/2022; Received: 08/30/2022

NOTICE OF SALE

NOTICE OF SALE; Filed By: Morgan, M.; Filed: 08/30/2022; Received: 08/30/2022

BILL OF COSTS

BILL OF COSTS; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/23/2022; Received: 08/23/2022

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE (Motion #2)

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE (Motion #2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/23/2022; Received: 08/23/2022

REFEREE REPORT OF AMOUNT DUE (Motion #2)

REFEREE REPORT OF AMOUNT DUE (Motion #2); Filed By: Morgan, M.; Filed: 08/18/2022; Received: 08/18/2022

OATH (Motion #2)

OATH (Motion #2); Filed By: Morgan, M.; Filed: 08/18/2022; Received: 08/18/2022

AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES (Motion #2)

AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES (Motion #2); Filed By: Morgan, M.; Filed: 08/18/2022; Received: 08/18/2022

BILL OF COSTS (Motion #2)

BILL OF COSTS (Motion #2); Filed By: Morgan, M.; Filed: 08/18/2022; Received: 08/18/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #2) Terms of Sale

EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #2) Terms of Sale; Filed By: Morgan, M.; Filed: 08/18/2022; Received: 08/18/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #2) Attorney Fee Affirmation

EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #2) Attorney Fee Affirmation; Filed By: Morgan, M.; Filed: 08/18/2022; Received: 08/18/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #2) Referee's Oath & Report

EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #2) Referee's Oath & Report; Filed By: Morgan, M.; Filed: 08/18/2022; Received: 08/18/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #2) Order of Reference

EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #2) Order of Reference; Filed By: Morgan, M.; Filed: 08/18/2022; Received: 08/18/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #2) Affirmation of Regularity

EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #2) Affirmation of Regularity; Filed By: Morgan, M.; Filed: 08/18/2022; Received: 08/18/2022

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 2; Relief Sought: Judgment - Foreclosure & Sale; Submit Date: 08/23/2022; Answer Demanded: No; Status: Decided: 08/23/2022 Granted Before Justice: Mc Clusky, Hon. James P.; Decision: Short Form Order; Order Signed Date: 08/23/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 1; Relief Sought: Appoint - Referee; Submit Date: 07/28/2022; Answer Demanded: No; Status: Decided: 07/28/2022 Granted Before Justice: Mc Clusky, Hon. James P.; Decision: Short Form Order; Order Signed Date: 07/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less