This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 04/21/2023 at 02:37:56 (UTC).

LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC vs. COYLE, JEFFERY et al

Case Summary

On 11/23/2022 LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against COYLE, JEFFERY. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Columbia, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2022

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC

Defendants

COYLE, JEFFERY et al

COYLE, JEFFERY

DOE, JOHN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gross Polowy LLC

Fourtner, Tracy McKay

GROSS POLOWY, LLC

Polowy, Amy E.

Gazzo, Nicole Carol

Vargas, Stephen John

Pascuzzi, Ashley Marie

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Pascuzzi, A.; Filed: 08/10/2022; Received: 08/10/2022

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Pascuzzi, A.; Filed: 08/10/2022; Received: 08/10/2022

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Pascuzzi, A.; Filed: 08/10/2022; Received: 08/10/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JEFFERY COYLE 3215

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JEFFERY COYLE 3215; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 08/26/2022; Received: 08/26/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JEFFERY COYLE AOS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JEFFERY COYLE AOS; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 08/26/2022; Received: 08/26/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Rose Klonowski s/h/a Jane Doe #1 1303

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Rose Klonowski s/h/a Jane Doe #1 1303; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 08/26/2022; Received: 08/26/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Rose Klonowski s/h/a Jane Doe #1 3215

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Rose Klonowski s/h/a Jane Doe #1 3215; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 08/26/2022; Received: 08/26/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Rose Klonowski s/h/a Jane Doe #1 AOS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Rose Klonowski s/h/a Jane Doe #1 AOS; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 08/26/2022; Received: 08/26/2022

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 08/26/2022; Received: 08/26/2022

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Vargas, S.; Filed: 09/28/2022; Received: 09/28/2022

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Vargas, S.; Filed: 09/28/2022; Received: 09/28/2022

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Fourtner, T.; Filed: 11/09/2022; Received: 11/09/2022

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Fourtner, T.; Filed: 11/23/2022; Received: 11/23/2022

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Fourtner, T.; Filed: 11/23/2022; Received: 11/23/2022

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/09/2023

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 03:30 PM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Foreclosure Settlement; Justice Part: Niagara County, Foreclosure Part FCP- Foreclosure Conference; Remarks: via Teams

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2023

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 03:30 PM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Foreclosure Settlement; Outcome Type: Continued; Justice Part: Niagara County, Foreclosure Part FCP- Foreclosure Conference; Remarks: via Teams

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2023

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 03:30 PM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Foreclosure Settlement; Outcome Type: Continued; Justice Part: Niagara County, Foreclosure Part FCP- Foreclosure Conference; Remarks: via Teams

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 03:00 PM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Foreclosure Settlement; Outcome Type: Continued; Justice Part: Niagara County, Foreclosure Part FCP- Foreclosure Conference; Remarks: via Teams

[+] Read More [-] Read Less