This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 04/30/2023 at 17:32:43 (UTC).

DEFILIPPO, THOMAS W et al vs. KRAYNA, MARTIN A et al

Case Summary

On 11/21/2022 DEFILIPPO, THOMAS W filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KRAYNA, MARTIN A. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Niagara, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Sedita III, Hon. Frank A.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2022

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Sedita III, Hon. Frank A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEFILIPPO, THOMAS W et al

Defendant

KRAYNA, MARTIN A et al

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JOHN J FROMEN, ATTORNEYS AT LAW, P.C.

Fromen Jr, John J.

Attea, Frederick George

Defendant Attorneys

Law Office of Victor M. Wright

Emminger, Rachel A.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Fromen, J.; Filed: 09/15/2022; Received: 09/15/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Fromen, J.; Filed: 10/07/2022; Received: 10/07/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Fromen, J.; Filed: 10/07/2022; Received: 10/07/2022

ANSWER Answer

ANSWER Answer; Filed By: Emminger, R.; Filed: 11/16/2022; Received: 11/16/2022

NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION

NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION; Filed By: Emminger, R.; Filed: 11/17/2022; Received: 11/17/2022

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Fromen, J.; Filed: 11/21/2022; Received: 11/21/2022

ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING

ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/03/2023; Received: 01/03/2023

 

Docket Entries

05/07/2023

DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conference-Stipulation; Justice Part: Sedita III, Hon. Frank A.; Remarks: Control Date until Closing Docs are filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2023

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 11:00 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Status; Outcome Type: Settled; Justice Part: Sedita III, Hon. Frank A. LC- Kristin St. Mary, Esq., Law Clerk to Hon. Frank Sedita, III; Remarks: Via Microsoft Teams

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/16/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 12:00 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Preliminary; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Sedita III, Hon. Frank A.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less