This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 04/25/2023 at 02:01:30 (UTC).

Hopkins, Shoshanna vs. McDonough, James

Case Summary

On 11/21/2022 Hopkins, Shoshanna filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against McDonough, James. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Niagara, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Pace, Hon. Edward. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2022

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Pace, Hon. Edward

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hopkins, Shoshanna

Defendant

McDonough, James

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PERLA & PERLA, LLP

Hackworth, Pamela Ann

Defendant Attorneys

RUPP BAASE PFALZGRAF CUNNINGHAM LLC

Yonkers, Jill Liane

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Hackworth, P.; Filed: 08/11/2022; Received: 08/11/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Hackworth, P.; Filed: 08/15/2022; Received: 08/15/2022

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Yonkers, J.; Filed: 09/01/2022; Received: 09/01/2022

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Hackworth, P.; Filed: 11/21/2022; Received: 11/21/2022

 

Docket Entries

07/18/2023

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:00 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Status; Justice Part: Pace, Hon. Edward LC- James Granville, Esq., Law Clerk to Hon. Edward Pace; Remarks: MS Teams

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2023

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:15 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Status; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Pace, Hon. Edward

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/04/2023

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 11:15 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Pre-Trial; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: CARUSO, Hon. FRANK

[+] Read More [-] Read Less