This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 04/27/2023 at 20:28:13 (UTC).

LECKIE, ISAIAH vs. SIEGWARTH, ROSAMOND C.

Case Summary

On 11/22/2022 LECKIE, ISAIAH filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SIEGWARTH, ROSAMOND C. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Niagara, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Sedita III, Hon. Frank A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2021

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Sedita III, Hon. Frank A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LECKIE, ISAIAH

Defendants

SIEGWARTH, ROSAMOND C.

LECKIE, DIANE SCOTT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ANDREWS, BERNSTEIN, MARANTO & NICOTRA, PLLC

Kotrys, Thomas P.

BARTH CONDREN, LLP

Hamberger, Douglas Paul

 

Court Documents

RJI -RE: OTHER Per Justice Sedita's request

RJI -RE: OTHER Per Justice Sedita's request; Filed By: Kotrys, T.; Filed: 11/22/2022; Received: 11/22/2022

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS on Counterclaim

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS on Counterclaim; Filed By: Chimera, D.; Filed: 09/30/2021; Received: 09/30/2021

REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)

REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S); Filed By: Chimera, D.; Filed: 09/30/2021; Received: 09/30/2021

ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) Answer to Third Party Complaint with Counterclaim

ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) Answer to Third Party Complaint with Counterclaim; Filed By: Trueman, A.; Filed: 09/13/2021; Received: 09/13/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - B Answer in underlying action

EXHIBIT(S) - B Answer in underlying action; Filed By: Chimera, D.; Filed: 08/11/2021; Received: 08/11/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - A Summons & Complaint - Underlying Action

EXHIBIT(S) - A Summons & Complaint - Underlying Action; Filed By: Chimera, D.; Filed: 08/11/2021; Received: 08/11/2021

THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT

THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT; Filed By: Chimera, D.; Filed: 08/11/2021; Received: 08/11/2021

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION; Filed By: Chimera, D.; Filed: 08/04/2021; Received: 08/04/2021

DEMAND FOR: Demand for Social Media

DEMAND FOR: Demand for Social Media; Filed By: Chimera, D.; Filed: 08/04/2021; Received: 08/04/2021

DEMAND FOR: Demand for Social Security Statement

DEMAND FOR: Demand for Social Security Statement; Filed By: Chimera, D.; Filed: 08/04/2021; Received: 08/04/2021

DEMAND FOR: Demand for Medicaid Lien

DEMAND FOR: Demand for Medicaid Lien; Filed By: Chimera, D.; Filed: 08/04/2021; Received: 08/04/2021

DEMAND FOR: Demand for School Authorizations

DEMAND FOR: Demand for School Authorizations; Filed By: Chimera, D.; Filed: 08/04/2021; Received: 08/04/2021

DEMAND FOR: Request for Supp. Demand

DEMAND FOR: Request for Supp. Demand; Filed By: Chimera, D.; Filed: 08/04/2021; Received: 08/04/2021

DEMAND FOR: Miscellaneous Disclosure Demands

DEMAND FOR: Miscellaneous Disclosure Demands; Filed By: Chimera, D.; Filed: 08/04/2021; Received: 08/04/2021

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Chimera, D.; Filed: 08/04/2021; Received: 08/04/2021

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Chimera, D.; Filed: 08/04/2021; Received: 08/04/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Kotrys, T.; Filed: 07/20/2021; Received: 07/20/2021

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Kotrys, T.; Filed: 06/18/2021; Received: 06/18/2021

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/22/2023

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Status; Justice Part: Sedita III, Hon. Frank A. LC- Kristin St. Mary, Esq., Law Clerk to Hon. Frank Sedita, III; Remarks: Via Microsoft Teams

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/20/2023

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 11:00 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Status; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Sedita III, Hon. Frank A. LC- Kristin St. Mary, Esq., Law Clerk to Hon. Frank Sedita, III

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2023

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 11:00 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Status; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Sedita III, Hon. Frank A. LC- Kristin St. Mary, Esq., Law Clerk to Hon. Frank Sedita, III; Remarks: Via Microsoft Teams

[+] Read More [-] Read Less