This case was last updated from Erie County Courts on 10/30/2021 at 23:46:03 (UTC).

CARTWRIGHT, SHAUNTE vs. CITY OF BUFFALO

Case Summary

On 01/18/2016 CARTWRIGHT, SHAUNTE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CITY OF BUFFALO. This case was filed in Erie County Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Bannister, Hon. Tracey A.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2015

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Erie, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Bannister, Hon. Tracey A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARTWRIGHT, SHAUNTE

Defendant

CITY OF BUFFALO

65 Niagara Sq., 1100 City Hall

Buffalo, NY 14202

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHAW & SHAW, P.C.

Attorney at SHAW & SHAW, P.C.

4819 S Park Ave

Hamburg, NY 14075-1424

 

Court Documents

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY

--none--

THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT

--none--

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) EBT Excerpt - Michael Giacobello

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) EBT Excerpt - Michael Giacobello; Filed By: Quinn, R.; Filed: 06/03/2018; Received: 06/03/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Expert Report

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Expert Report; Filed By: Quinn, R.; Filed: 06/03/2018; Received: 06/03/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Photographs

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Photographs; Filed By: Quinn, R.; Filed: 06/03/2018; Received: 06/03/2018

AFFIRMATION (Motion #001)

AFFIRMATION (Motion #001); Filed By: Quinn, R.; Filed: 06/03/2018; Received: 06/03/2018

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Quinn, R.; Filed: 06/03/2018; Received: 06/03/2018

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Depaolo, J.; Filed: 05/24/2018; Received: 05/24/2018

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Depaolo, J.; Filed: 05/24/2018; Received: 05/24/2018

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/01/2018; Received: 05/01/2018

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION TP Def ND&I

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION TP Def ND&I Filed By: Harbold, T.; Filed: 05/01/2018; Received: 05/01/2018

ANSWER TP Def Answer

ANSWER TP Def Answer; Filed By: Harbold, T.; Filed: 05/01/2018; Received: 05/01/2018

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Brunette, V.; Filed: 04/13/2018; Received: 04/13/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B Answer

EXHIBIT(S) - B Answer; Filed By: Brunette, V.; Filed: 04/13/2018; Received: 04/13/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A Summons & Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Brunette, V.; Filed: 04/13/2018; Received: 04/13/2018

THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT

THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT; Filed By: Brunette, V.; Filed: 04/13/2018; Received: 04/13/2018

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Brunette, V.; Filed: 04/13/2018; Received: 04/13/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B Answer

EXHIBIT(S) - B Answer; Filed By: Brunette, V.; Filed: 04/13/2018; Received: 04/13/2018

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Trial-Jury; Outcome Type: Closed; Justice Part: Bannister, Hon. Tracey A. Part 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:00 AM; Court Date Purpose: Trial-Jury Selection; Outcome Type: Closed; Justice Part: Bannister, Hon. Tracey A. Commissioner of Jurors

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Motion-Notice of Motion; Outcome Type: Settled; Justice Part: Bannister, Hon. Tracey A. Part 31; Motion Seq: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conference-Settlement; Outcome Type: Settled; Justice Part: Bannister, Hon. Tracey A. Part 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 1; Filed By: DEFENDANT; Relief Sought: Preclude; Submit Date: 06/06/2018; Answer Demanded: Yes; Status: Decided: 06/06/2018 Settled Before Justice: Bannister, Hon. Tracey A.; Decision: Oral

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:00 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Compliance; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Bannister, Hon. Tracey A. Part 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Compliance; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Bannister, Hon. Tracey A. Part 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Trial-Jury; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Bannister, Hon. Tracey A. Part 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:00 AM; Court Date Purpose: Trial-Jury Selection; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Bannister, Hon. Tracey A. Commissioner of Jurors

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 11:00 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Compliance; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Bannister, Hon. Tracey A. Part 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Stay; Justice Part: Bannister, Hon. Tracey A. Part 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 11:00 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Compliance; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Bannister, Hon. Tracey A. Part 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Alternative Dispute Resolution; Justice Part: Bannister, Hon. Tracey A. Part 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:00 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Compliance; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Bannister, Hon. Tracey A. Part 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:15 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Compliance; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Bannister, Hon. Tracey A. Part 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Compliance; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Bannister, Hon. Tracey A. Part 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Compliance; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Bannister, Hon. Tracey A. Part 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:00 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Compliance; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Bannister, Hon. Tracey A. Part 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Preliminary; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Bannister, Hon. Tracey A. Part 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:00 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Bannister, Hon. Tracey A. Part 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less