This case was last updated from Erie County Courts on 10/30/2021 at 22:58:08 (UTC).

Anonymous vs. BRUCKHEIMER, SUSAN

Case Summary

On 07/06/2016 Anonymous filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BRUCKHEIMER, SUSAN. This case was filed in Erie County Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Grisanti, Hon. Mark J.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2015

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Erie, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Grisanti, Hon. Mark J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anonymous

Defendant

BRUCKHEIMER, SUSAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Riordan & Scalione

Attorney at Riordan & Scalione

4498 Main St Ste 11

Amherst, NY 14226-3826

Steve Boyd, PC

Attorney at Steve Boyd, PC

40 N Forest Rd

Williamsville, NY 14221-5230

Defendant Attorneys

BUFFALO STAFF COUNSEL MANAGING ATTORNEY

Attorney at BUFFALO STAFF COUNSEL MANAGING ATTORNEY

170 Franklin St Ste 500

Buffalo, NY 14202-2412

THE O'BRIEN FIRM PC

Attorney at THE O'BRIEN FIRM PC

4925 Main Street, Ste 222

Buffalo, NY 14226

 

Court Documents

ORDER - COMPROMISE & SETTLEMENT (Motion #004) ORDER OF INFANT SETTLEMENT

ORDER - COMPROMISE & SETTLEMENT (Motion #004) ORDER OF INFANT SETTLEMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/03/2018; Received: 08/03/2018

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #004) Proposed Order

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #004) Proposed Order; Filed By: Boyd, S.; Filed: 08/01/2018; Received: 08/01/2018

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #004) Final Medicaid Lien Letter

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #004) Final Medicaid Lien Letter; Filed By: Boyd, S.; Filed: 08/01/2018; Received: 08/01/2018

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #004) Letter to Judge Enclosing Medicaid Lien Letter & Proposed Order

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #004) Letter to Judge Enclosing Medicaid Lien Letter & Proposed Order; Filed By: Boyd, S.; Filed: 08/01/2018; Received: 08/01/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #004) Petition for Infant Settlement

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #004) Petition for Infant Settlement; Filed By: Boyd, S.; Filed: 07/17/2018; Received: 07/17/2018

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #004) Proposed Order

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #004) Proposed Order; Filed By: Boyd, S.; Filed: 07/13/2018; Received: 07/13/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #004) Disbursements

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #004) Disbursements; Filed By: Boyd, S.; Filed: 07/13/2018; Received: 07/13/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #004) Hospital Records

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #004) Hospital Records; Filed By: Boyd, S.; Filed: 07/13/2018; Received: 07/13/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #004) Photos

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #004) Photos; Filed By: Boyd, S.; Filed: 07/13/2018; Received: 07/13/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #004) Attorney Affirmation

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #004) Attorney Affirmation; Filed By: Boyd, S.; Filed: 07/13/2018; Received: 07/13/2018

NOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #004) *Corrected* Notice of Petition for Infant Settlement

NOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #004) *Corrected* Notice of Petition for Infant Settlement; Filed By: Boyd, S.; Filed: 07/13/2018; Received: 07/17/2018

ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING EIGHTH AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER

ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING EIGHTH AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/01/2018; Received: 03/01/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #003) Verified Answer to Third-Party Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #003) Verified Answer to Third-Party Complaint; Filed By: O'Brien, C.; Filed: 02/27/2018; Received: 02/27/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #003) Attorney Reply Affirmation

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #003) Attorney Reply Affirmation; Filed By: O'Brien, C.; Filed: 02/27/2018; Received: 02/27/2018

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #002)

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #002); Filed By: Boyd, S.; Filed: 02/26/2018; Received: 02/26/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #003) TRANSCRIPT JOSEPH MARRELLI

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #003) TRANSCRIPT JOSEPH MARRELLI; Filed By: Archilla, D.; Filed: 02/26/2018; Received: 02/26/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #003) AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #003) AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION; Filed By: Archilla, D.; Filed: 02/26/2018; Received: 02/26/2018

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION Third Party Defendant

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION Third Party Defendant; Filed By: O'Brien, C.; Filed: 02/26/2018; Received: 02/26/2018

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 11:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Motion-Notice of Petition; Outcome Type: Granted; Justice Part: Grisanti, Hon. Mark J.; Motion Seq: 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 4; Relief Sought: Approve Settlement; Submit Date: 07/26/2018; Answer Demanded: No; Status: Decided: 07/26/2018 Granted Before Justice: Grisanti, Hon. Mark J.; Decision: Oral; Order Signed Date: 08/03/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:15 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Pre-Trial; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Grisanti, Hon. Mark J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Motion-Order to Show Cause (Initial Application); Outcome Type: Withdrawn; Justice Part: Grisanti, Hon. Mark J.; Motion Seq: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Pre-Trial; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Grisanti, Hon. Mark J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Motion-Order to Show Cause (Initial Application); Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Grisanti, Hon. Mark J.; Motion Seq: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Trial-Jury; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Grisanti, Hon. Mark J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Motion-Order to Show Cause (Initial Application); Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Grisanti, Hon. Mark J.; Motion Seq: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conference-Pre-Trial; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Grisanti, Hon. Mark J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Motion-Order to Show Cause (Initial Application); Outcome Type: Continued; Justice Part: Grisanti, Hon. Mark J.; Motion Seq: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 07/07/2017
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:00 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Status; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Grisanti, Hon. Mark J. Part 15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Motion-Other; Outcome Type: Fully Submitted; Justice Part: Grisanti, Hon. Mark J. Part 15; Motion Seq: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 1; Filed By: PLAINTIFF; Relief Sought: Parties - Add/Substitute/Intervene; Submit Date: 07/07/2017; Answer Demanded: No; Status: Decided: 07/07/2017 Granted Before Justice: Grisanti, Hon. Mark J.; Decision: Oral; Order Signed Date: 11/14/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • DocketAppearance Information: Court Date Purpose: Conference-Compliance; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Grisanti, Hon. Mark J. Part 15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:00 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Compliance; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Grisanti, Hon. Mark J. Part 15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 12:30 PM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Compliance; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Grisanti, Hon. Mark J. Part 15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:00 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conversion-Other; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Justice Part: Grisanti, Hon. Mark J. Part 15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Compliance; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Grisanti, Hon. Mark J. Part 15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 01:30 PM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Compliance; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Grisanti, Hon. Mark J. Part 15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:30 AM; Court Date Purpose: Conference-Preliminary; Outcome Type: Held; Justice Part: Grisanti, Hon. Mark J. Part 15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less