This case was last updated from Richmond County New York Courts on 08/19/2022 at 07:23:29 (UTC).

ZHANNA OGNEVA v. SHARON J. FIER et al

Case Summary

On 10/18/2021 ZHANNA OGNEVA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SHARON J FIER. This case was filed in Richmond County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Nassau, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald Castorina. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2021

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Ronald Castorina

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Zhanna Ogneva

Defendants

Sharon J. Fier

Mitchl S Fier

Michael Levin

Oleg Ognev

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FORZANO, ANTHONY J.

Defendant Attorneys

LEWIS, JEFFREY WILLS

SAHNI, RASLEEN K

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Verified Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Verified Complaint; Filed By: Forzano, A.; Filed: 10/18/2021; Received: 10/18/2021

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Appearance

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Appearance; Filed By: Lewis, J.; Filed: 11/11/2021; Received: 11/11/2021

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Answer with Cross-Claim & Combined Demands

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Answer with Cross-Claim & Combined Demands; Filed By: Lewis, J.; Filed: 11/11/2021; Received: 11/11/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFD of Service S&C 1

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFD of Service S&C 1; Filed By: Forzano, A.; Filed: 11/23/2021; Received: 11/23/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFD of Service S&C 2

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFD of Service S&C 2; Filed By: Forzano, A.; Filed: 11/23/2021; Received: 11/23/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFD of Service S&C 3

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFD of Service S&C 3; Filed By: Forzano, A.; Filed: 11/23/2021; Received: 11/23/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFD of Service S&C 4

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFD of Service S&C 4; Filed By: Forzano, A.; Filed: 11/23/2021; Received: 11/23/2021

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (PRE RJI) Notice of Address Change

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (PRE RJI) Notice of Address Change; Filed By: Lewis, J.; Filed: 02/07/2022; Received: 02/07/2022

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Sahni, R. - filed by Law Office of Nicole Lesperance; Filed: 03/02/2022; Received: 03/02/2022

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Sahni, R. - filed by Law Office of Nicole Lesperance; Filed: 03/02/2022; Received: 03/02/2022

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Forzano, A.; Filed: 05/11/2022; Received: 05/11/2022

AFFIDAVIT Statement of Unavailability

AFFIDAVIT Statement of Unavailability; Filed By: Lewis, J.; Filed: 06/16/2022; Received: 06/16/2022

DEMAND FOR: OS Discovery-Letter of Good Faith

DEMAND FOR: OS Discovery-Letter of Good Faith; Filed By: Sahni, R. - filed by Law Office of Nicole Lesperance; Filed: 07/05/2022; Received: 07/05/2022

ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -REQUEST Statement of Unavailability

ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -REQUEST Statement of Unavailability; Filed By: Lewis, J.; Filed: 07/25/2022; Received: 07/25/2022

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE Stipulation to Adjourn Preliminary Conference

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE Stipulation to Adjourn Preliminary Conference; Filed By: Lewis, J.; Filed: 08/08/2022; Received: 08/08/2022

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE 8/17/2022 conference

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE 8/17/2022 conference; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/18/2022; Received: 08/18/2022

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE 8/17/2022 conference; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/18/2022; Received: 08/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE Stipulation to Adjourn Preliminary Conference; Filed By: Lewis, J.; Filed: 08/08/2022; Received: 08/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -REQUEST Statement of Unavailability; Filed By: Lewis, J.; Filed: 07/25/2022; Received: 07/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: OS Discovery-Letter of Good Faith; Filed By: Sahni, R. - filed by Law Office of Nicole Lesperance; Filed: 07/05/2022; Received: 07/05/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Statement of Unavailability; Filed By: Lewis, J.; Filed: 06/16/2022; Received: 06/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Forzano, A.; Filed: 05/11/2022; Received: 05/11/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Sahni, R. - filed by Law Office of Nicole Lesperance; Filed: 03/02/2022; Received: 03/02/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Sahni, R. - filed by Law Office of Nicole Lesperance; Filed: 03/02/2022; Received: 03/02/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (PRE RJI) Notice of Address Change; Filed By: Lewis, J.; Filed: 02/07/2022; Received: 02/07/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFD of Service S&C 4; Filed By: Forzano, A.; Filed: 11/23/2021; Received: 11/23/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFD of Service S&C 3; Filed By: Forzano, A.; Filed: 11/23/2021; Received: 11/23/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFD of Service S&C 2; Filed By: Forzano, A.; Filed: 11/23/2021; Received: 11/23/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFD of Service S&C 1; Filed By: Forzano, A.; Filed: 11/23/2021; Received: 11/23/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Answer with Cross-Claim & Combined Demands; Filed By: Lewis, J.; Filed: 11/11/2021; Received: 11/11/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Appearance; Filed By: Lewis, J.; Filed: 11/11/2021; Received: 11/11/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Verified Complaint; Filed By: Forzano, A.; Filed: 10/18/2021; Received: 10/18/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less