This case was last updated from Albany County Courts on 03/12/2020 at 01:42:22 (UTC).

Zabinski Holdings, LLC et al v. Capital Siding & Construction, LLC d/b/a ABAR Construction et al

Case Summary

On 09/03/2019 Zabinski Holdings, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Capital Siding Construction, LLC d/b/a ABAR Construction. This case was filed in Albany County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9-19

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Albany, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Zabinski Holdings, LLC

Paul Zabinski

Thomas Zabinski

Defendants

William Richard Barber

Capital Siding & Construction, LLC d/b/a ABAR Construction

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TOWNE, JAMES THOMPSON

Attorney at Towne, Ryan & Partners, P.C.

Defendant Attorney

DREYER, WILLIAM JAMES

Attorney at DREYER BOYAJIAN LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Dreyer, W.; Filed: 10/28/2019; Received: 10/28/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS of Amended Summons and Complaint on Capital Siding

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS of Amended Summons and Complaint on Capital Siding; Filed By: Towne, J.; Filed: 10/24/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS of Amended Summons and Complaint on Barber

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS of Amended Summons and Complaint on Barber; Filed By: Towne, J.; Filed: 10/24/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

COMPLAINT (AMENDED) Amended Complaint

COMPLAINT (AMENDED) Amended Complaint; Filed By: Towne, J.; Filed: 10/04/2019; Received: 10/04/2019

SUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED) Amended Summons

SUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED) Amended Summons; Filed By: Towne, J.; Filed: 10/04/2019; Received: 10/04/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Towne, J.; Filed: 09/16/2019; Received: 09/16/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Towne, J.; Filed: 09/16/2019; Received: 09/16/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Towne, J.; Filed: 09/16/2019; Received: 09/16/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Towne, J.; Filed: 09/03/2019; Received: 09/03/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Dreyer, W.; Filed: 10/28/2019; Received: 10/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS of Amended Summons and Complaint on Capital Siding; Filed By: Towne, J.; Filed: 10/24/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS of Amended Summons and Complaint on Barber; Filed By: Towne, J.; Filed: 10/24/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (AMENDED) Amended Complaint; Filed By: Towne, J.; Filed: 10/04/2019; Received: 10/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED) Amended Summons; Filed By: Towne, J.; Filed: 10/04/2019; Received: 10/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Towne, J.; Filed: 09/16/2019; Received: 09/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Towne, J.; Filed: 09/16/2019; Received: 09/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Towne, J.; Filed: 09/16/2019; Received: 09/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Towne, J.; Filed: 09/03/2019; Received: 09/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less