This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 21:47:18 (UTC).

YVETTE PAGAN v. MORRIS HEIGHTS HEALTH CENTER, INC.

Case Summary

On 04/21/2019 YVETTE PAGAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MORRIS HEIGHTS HEALTH CENTER, INC. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******019E

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Bronx County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Yvette Pagan

Defendant

MORRIS HEIGHTS HEALTH CENTER, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LINDER, MARK

Attorney at HARMON, LINDER & ROGOWSKY, ESQS.

 

Court Documents

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) DATED 1/2/2020

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) DATED 1/2/2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Linder, M.; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Affidavits of Service

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Affidavits of Service; Filed By: Linder, M.; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Linder, M.; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Affidavit in support of this motion

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Affidavit in support of this motion; Filed By: Linder, M.; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001); Filed By: Linder, M.; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Linder, M.; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 05/07/2019; Received: 05/07/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 05/01/2019; Received: 05/01/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 04/21/2019; Received: 04/21/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 04/21/2019; Received: 04/21/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) DATED 1/2/2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Linder, M.; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Affidavits of Service; Filed By: Linder, M.; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Linder, M.; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Affidavit in support of this motion; Filed By: Linder, M.; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001); Filed By: Linder, M.; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Linder, M.; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 05/07/2019; Received: 05/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 05/01/2019; Received: 05/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 04/21/2019; Received: 04/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 04/21/2019; Received: 04/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less