This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 17:18:31 (UTC).

Yulanda Rankin - v. - Sheena A Moody et al

Case Summary

On 07/19/2017 Yulanda Rankin filed an Other lawsuit against Sheena A Moody. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2017

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Niagara County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Yulanda Rankin

Defendants

Sheena A Moody

Margo L Lindsey

PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY

Not Yet Classified

PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOND, KEITH N

Attorney at Walsh, Roberts & Grace LLC

Not Yet Classified Attorney

PALMERTON, NICOLE B.

Attorney at Law Offices of Jennifer S. Adams

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Palmerton, N.; Filed: 10/11/2017; Received: 10/11/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Bond, K.; Filed: 08/14/2017; Received: 08/14/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Bond, K.; Filed: 08/14/2017; Received: 08/14/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Bond, K.; Filed: 08/14/2017; Received: 08/14/2017

COMPLAINT (AMENDED)

COMPLAINT (AMENDED); Filed By: Bond, K.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

SUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED)

SUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED); Filed By: Bond, K.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Bond, K.; Filed: 07/19/2017; Received: 07/19/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Palmerton, N.; Filed: 10/11/2017; Received: 10/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Bond, K.; Filed: 08/14/2017; Received: 08/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Bond, K.; Filed: 08/14/2017; Received: 08/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Bond, K.; Filed: 08/14/2017; Received: 08/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (AMENDED); Filed By: Bond, K.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED); Filed By: Bond, K.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Bond, K.; Filed: 07/19/2017; Received: 07/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less