This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 02/22/2020 at 22:07:13 (UTC).

YELIZA PEREZ-SURIEL v. LUIS M. PENA et al

Case Summary

On 02/21/2019 YELIZA PEREZ-SURIEL filed an Other lawsuit against LUIS M PENA. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******019E

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Bronx County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Yeliza Perez-suriel

Defendants

Luis M. Pena

Miguel A. Ramos

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KHAVINSON, EUGENE A.

Attorney at Khavinson and Associates PC

Defendant Attorney

LEVEN, ADRIANNE JOY

Attorney at BAKER, McEVOY, MORRISSEY & MOSKOVITS, PC

 

Court Documents

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Leven, A. - filed by BAKER,MCEVOY,MORRISSEY & MOSKOVITS,P.C; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Leven, A. - filed by BAKER,MCEVOY,MORRISSEY & MOSKOVITS,P.C; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Khavinson, E.; Filed: 03/13/2019; Received: 03/13/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Khavinson, E.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Khavinson, E.; Filed: 03/29/2019; Received: 03/29/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Khavinson, E.; Filed: 03/29/2019; Received: 03/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Khavinson, E.; Filed: 03/13/2019; Received: 03/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Leven, A. - filed by BAKER,MCEVOY,MORRISSEY & MOSKOVITS,P.C; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Leven, A. - filed by BAKER,MCEVOY,MORRISSEY & MOSKOVITS,P.C; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Khavinson, E.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less