This case was last updated from Steuben County Courts on 06/24/2020 at 16:43:37 (UTC).

XCEED FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION v. ANGELA M. WILLIAMS, AS EXECUTRIX OF THE ESTATE OF CHRISTINA M. HOWE AKA CHRISTINA MAE HOWE AKA CHRISTINA HOWE AKA CHRISTINA M. PERRY, DECEASED et al

Case Summary

On 04/16/2019 XCEED FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ANGELA M WILLIAMS, AS EXECUTRIX OF THE ESTATE OF CHRISTINA M HOWE AKA CHRISTINA MAE HOWE AKA CHRISTINA HOWE AKA CHRISTINA M PERRY, DECEASED. This case was filed in Steuben County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert B Wiggins. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********69CV

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Steuben, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Robert B Wiggins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

XCEED FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendants

Christina m Est Howe

Christina Dec Howe

NYS DEPARTMENT TAXATION & FINANCE

Christina m Dec Perry

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAPP, STEPHEN

Attorney at Forsyth, Howe, O'Dwyer, Kalb & Murphy, P.C.

DREXLER, MARK ANDREW

Attorney at MARK A DREXLER ESQ

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Lapp, S.; Filed: 12/11/2019; Received: 12/11/2019

AFFIRMATION Affirmation in Support of Discontinuance and Cancellation of Notice of Pendency

AFFIRMATION Affirmation in Support of Discontinuance and Cancellation of Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Lapp, S.; Filed: 12/11/2019; Received: 12/11/2019

STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY

STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Lapp, S.; Filed: 12/11/2019; Received: 12/11/2019

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/16/2019; Received: 09/16/2019

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

ORDER - OTHER

ORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/05/2019; Received: 07/05/2019

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/05/2019; Received: 07/05/2019

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Lapp, S.; Filed: 07/01/2019; Received: 07/01/2019

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Lapp, S.; Filed: 07/01/2019; Received: 07/01/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BRADLEY WILLIAMS S/H/A JOHN DOE #1

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BRADLEY WILLIAMS S/H/A JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: Drexler, M. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 05/01/2019; Received: 05/01/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE LAURIA WILLIAMS S/H/A JOHN DOE #2

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE LAURIA WILLIAMS S/H/A JOHN DOE #2; Filed By: Drexler, M. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 05/01/2019; Received: 05/01/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ANGELA M. WILLIAMS, AS EXECUTRIX OF THE ESTATE OF CHRISTINA M. HOWE AKA CHRIST(..)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ANGELA M. WILLIAMS, AS EXECUTRIX OF THE ESTATE OF CHRISTINA M. HOWE AKA CHRIST(..); Filed By: Drexler, M. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 05/01/2019; Received: 05/01/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Drexler, M. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 05/01/2019; Received: 05/01/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE; Filed By: Drexler, M. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 05/01/2019; Received: 05/01/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Lapp, S. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Lapp, S. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Lapp, S. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Lapp, S. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Lapp, S.; Filed: 12/11/2019; Received: 12/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Affirmation in Support of Discontinuance and Cancellation of Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Lapp, S.; Filed: 12/11/2019; Received: 12/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Lapp, S.; Filed: 12/11/2019; Received: 12/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/16/2019; Received: 09/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/05/2019; Received: 07/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/05/2019; Received: 07/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Lapp, S.; Filed: 07/01/2019; Received: 07/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Lapp, S.; Filed: 07/01/2019; Received: 07/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING 3215 - ANGELA M. WILLIAMS, AS EXECUTRIX OF THE ESTATE OF CHRISTINA M. HOWE AKA CHRISTINA MAE HOWE AKA CHRISTINA HOWE AKA CHRISTINA M. PERRY, DECEASED; Filed By: Drexler, M. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 05/16/2019; Received: 05/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING LAURIA WILLIAMS S/H/A JOHN DOE #2; Filed By: Drexler, M. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 05/01/2019; Received: 05/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BRADLEY WILLIAMS S/H/A JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: Drexler, M. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 05/01/2019; Received: 05/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE LAURIA WILLIAMS S/H/A JOHN DOE #2; Filed By: Drexler, M. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 05/01/2019; Received: 05/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ANGELA M. WILLIAMS, AS EXECUTRIX OF THE ESTATE OF CHRISTINA M. HOWE AKA CHRISTINA MAE HOWE AKA CHRISTINA HOWE AKA CHRISTINA M. PERRY, DECEASED; Filed By: Drexler, M. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 05/01/2019; Received: 05/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Drexler, M. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 05/01/2019; Received: 05/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE; Filed By: Drexler, M. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 05/01/2019; Received: 05/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Lapp, S. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Lapp, S. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Lapp, S. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Lapp, S. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less