This case was last updated from Dutchess County Courts on 04/16/2020 at 04:13:07 (UTC).

Wingate of Dutchess, Inc., d/b/a Wingate at Dutchess v. Gilbert Gallup et al

Case Summary

On 11/02/2017 Wingate of Dutchess, Inc , d/b/a Wingate at Dutchess filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Gilbert Gallup. This case was filed in Dutchess County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2813

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Dutchess, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wingate of Dutchess, Inc., d/b/a Wingate at Dutchess

Defendants

Irene Gallup

Gilbert Gallup

Not Yet Classified

Jamie Place

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GENOVA, MICHAEL A

Not Yet Classified and Defendant Attorney

DEFAZIO, ANTHONY MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) STIP OF DISC WITH PREJ

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) STIP OF DISC WITH PREJ; Filed By: Genova, M.; Filed: 02/06/2020; Received: 02/06/2020

SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED

SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED

SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED

SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

ORDER - OTHER short form order

ORDER - OTHER short form order; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

ORDER - OTHER

ORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/16/2019; Received: 12/12/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF RESPONDS TO DEMAND FOR MEDICAL RECORDS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF RESPONDS TO DEMAND FOR MEDICAL RECORDS; Filed By: Genova, M.; Filed: 09/09/2019; Received: 09/09/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - Y SCREEN FORM NUTRITIONAL NOTES AND WINGATE DAILY CHARTS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - Y SCREEN FORM NUTRITIONAL NOTES AND WINGATE DAILY CHARTS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Genova, M.; Filed: 09/09/2019; Received: 09/09/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - X SOCIAL SERVICE AND BUSINESS OFFICE RECORDS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - X SOCIAL SERVICE AND BUSINESS OFFICE RECORDS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Genova, M.; Filed: 09/09/2019; Received: 09/09/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Exhibit D Order

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Exhibit D Order; Filed By: Genova, M.; Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Exhibit C Petition for Letters of Administration

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Exhibit C Petition for Letters of Administration; Filed By: Genova, M.; Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Exhibit B Answer

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Exhibit B Answer; Filed By: Genova, M.; Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Attorney Affidavit in Support

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Attorney Affidavit in Support; Filed By: Genova, M.; Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion to Amend Complaint

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion to Amend Complaint; Filed By: Genova, M.; Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (PRE RJI) Notice of Change of Address

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (PRE RJI) Notice of Change of Address; Filed By: Genova, M.; Filed: 05/09/2018; Received: 05/09/2018

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Defazio, A.; Filed: 12/06/2017; Received: 12/06/2017

SUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED) Amended Summons Only

SUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED) Amended Summons Only; Filed By: Genova, M.; Filed: 11/10/2017; Received: 11/10/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Verified Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Verified Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Genova, M.; Filed: 11/02/2017; Received: 11/02/2017

74 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) STIP OF DISC WITH PREJ; Filed By: Genova, M.; Filed: 02/06/2020; Received: 02/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBPOENA - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBPOENA - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBPOENA - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER short form order; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/16/2019; Received: 12/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF RESPONDS TO DEMAND FOR MEDICAL RECORDS; Filed By: Genova, M.; Filed: 09/09/2019; Received: 09/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - Y SCREEN FORM NUTRITIONAL NOTES AND WINGATE DAILY CHARTS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Genova, M.; Filed: 09/09/2019; Received: 09/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - X SOCIAL SERVICE AND BUSINESS OFFICE RECORDS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Genova, M.; Filed: 09/09/2019; Received: 09/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - W WOUND CARE NOTES Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Genova, M.; Filed: 09/09/2019; Received: 09/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
67 More Docket Entries
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Exhibit D Order; Filed By: Genova, M.; Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Exhibit C Petition for Letters of Administration; Filed By: Genova, M.; Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Exhibit B Answer; Filed By: Genova, M.; Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Exhibit A Summons and Complaint Un-Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Genova, M.; Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Attorney Affidavit in Support; Filed By: Genova, M.; Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion to Amend Complaint; Filed By: Genova, M.; Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (PRE RJI) Notice of Change of Address; Filed By: Genova, M.; Filed: 05/09/2018; Received: 05/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Defazio, A.; Filed: 12/06/2017; Received: 12/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED) Amended Summons Only; Filed By: Genova, M.; Filed: 11/10/2017; Received: 11/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Verified Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Genova, M.; Filed: 11/02/2017; Received: 11/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less