This case was last updated from Westchester County Courts on 02/17/2020 at 17:43:37 (UTC).

WILMINGTON TRUST, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS TRUSTEE FOR SEQUOIA MORTGAGE TRUST 2013-10 - v. - JUSTIN STANGEL et al

Case Summary

On 07/03/2017 WILMINGTON TRUST, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS TRUSTEE FOR SEQUOIA MORTGAGE TRUST 2013-10 filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against JUSTIN STANGEL. This case was filed in Westchester County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2017

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Westchester County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Westchester, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILMINGTON TRUST, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS TRUSTEE FOR SEQUOIA MORTGAGE TRUST 2013-10

Defendants

John Doe #1 TO JOHN DOE #10,the last 10 names being fictitious and unknown to plaintiff, the persons or parties intended being the persons or parties, if any, having or claiming an interest in or lien upon the mortgaged premises described in the veri

Justin Stangel

Lara Stangel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPOSATO, MELISSA A.

Attorney at MCCABE WEISBERG & CONWAY, LLC

Defendant Attorney

KAISER, BARRY S

Attorney at BARRY S. & KAISER

 

Court Documents

ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #1)

ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/20/2018; Received: 06/19/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Filed Notice of Pendency

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Filed Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 05/08/2018; Received: 05/08/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Filed Affidavit of Service

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Filed Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 05/08/2018; Received: 05/08/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 05/08/2018; Received: 05/08/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 05/08/2018; Received: 05/08/2018

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1)

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 05/08/2018; Received: 05/08/2018

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 05/08/2018; Received: 05/08/2018

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/20/2018; Received: 02/20/2018

NOTICE

NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/27/2017; Received: 12/27/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aom 3215 justin stangel

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aom 3215 justin stangel; Filed By: Sposato, M. - filed by Expedited Legal Support Services, Inc.; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aom justin stangel

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aom justin stangel; Filed By: Sposato, M. - filed by Expedited Legal Support Services, Inc.; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos justin stangel

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos justin stangel; Filed By: Sposato, M. - filed by Expedited Legal Support Services, Inc.; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Kaiser, B.; Filed: 08/31/2017; Received: 08/31/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING NOC

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING NOC; Filed By: Sposato, M. - filed by Expedited Legal Support Services, Inc.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

AFFIDAVIT LP AOM_STANGEL

AFFIDAVIT LP AOM_STANGEL; Filed By: Sposato, M. - filed by Expedited Legal Support Services, Inc.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

AFFIDAVIT LP AFFIDAVIT_JUSTIN STANGEL

AFFIDAVIT LP AFFIDAVIT_JUSTIN STANGEL; Filed By: Sposato, M. - filed by Expedited Legal Support Services, Inc.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 07/03/2017; Received: 07/03/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 07/03/2017; Received: 07/03/2017

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/20/2018; Received: 06/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Filed Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 05/08/2018; Received: 05/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Filed Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 05/08/2018; Received: 05/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 05/08/2018; Received: 05/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 05/08/2018; Received: 05/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 05/08/2018; Received: 05/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 05/08/2018; Received: 05/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/20/2018; Received: 02/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/27/2017; Received: 12/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 12/22/2017; Received: 12/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos lara stangel; Filed By: Sposato, M. - filed by Expedited Legal Support Services, Inc.; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aom 3215 justin stangel; Filed By: Sposato, M. - filed by Expedited Legal Support Services, Inc.; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aom justin stangel; Filed By: Sposato, M. - filed by Expedited Legal Support Services, Inc.; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos justin stangel; Filed By: Sposato, M. - filed by Expedited Legal Support Services, Inc.; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Kaiser, B.; Filed: 08/31/2017; Received: 08/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING NOC; Filed By: Sposato, M. - filed by Expedited Legal Support Services, Inc.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT LP AOM_STANGEL; Filed By: Sposato, M. - filed by Expedited Legal Support Services, Inc.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT LP AFFIDAVIT_JUSTIN STANGEL; Filed By: Sposato, M. - filed by Expedited Legal Support Services, Inc.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 07/03/2017; Received: 07/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 07/03/2017; Received: 07/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less