This case was last updated from Oneida County Courts on 02/09/2020 at 13:41:46 (UTC).

Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Successor Trustee to Citibank, N.A., as Trustee for Bear Stearns Asset - v. - Kyle Stockbridge et al

Case Summary

On 05/01/2017 Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Successor Trustee to Citibank, N A , as Trustee for Bear Stearns Asset filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Kyle Stockbridge. This case was filed in Oneida County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********0799

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Oneida County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Oneida, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Successor Trustee to Citibank, N.A., as Trustee for Bear Stearns Asset Backed Securities I Trust 2006-HE3, Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2006-HE3

Defendants

Kyle Stockbridge a/k/a Kyle R. Stockbridge

JOHN DOE said name being fictitious it being the intention of Plaintiff to designate any and all occupants of premises being foreclosed herein and any parties corporations or entities if any having or claiming an interest or lien upon the mortgaged p

Deborah Stockbridge a/k/a Deborah J. Stockbridge

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DI CARO, JOHN A

Attorney at SHAPIRO, DICARO & BARAK, LLP

 

Court Documents

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 10/08/2018; Received: 10/08/2018

FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM

FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 07/13/2018; Received: 07/13/2018

REFEREE REPORT OF SALE

REFEREE REPORT OF SALE; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 07/13/2018; Received: 07/13/2018

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 04/13/2018; Received: 04/13/2018

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/05/2018; Received: 04/05/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #02) Additional Notice of Pendency

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #02) Additional Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 11/29/2017; Received: 11/29/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #02) Certificate of Merit

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #02) Certificate of Merit; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 11/29/2017; Received: 11/29/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #02) Military Status Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #02) Military Status Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 11/29/2017; Received: 11/29/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #02) Power of Attorney

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #02) Power of Attorney; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 11/29/2017; Received: 11/29/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 07/13/2017; Received: 07/13/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Additional Notice of Pendency

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Additional Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 07/12/2017; Received: 07/12/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Western District Process Service, LLC; Filed: 07/02/2017; Received: 07/02/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Western District Process Service, LLC; Filed: 06/18/2017; Received: 06/18/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Western District Process Service, LLC; Filed: 06/18/2017; Received: 06/18/2017

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 05/01/2017; Received: 05/01/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 05/01/2017; Received: 05/01/2017

COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 05/01/2017; Received: 05/01/2017

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 05/01/2017; Received: 05/01/2017

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 10/08/2018; Received: 10/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 07/13/2018; Received: 07/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREFEREE REPORT OF SALE; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 07/13/2018; Received: 07/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 04/13/2018; Received: 04/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/05/2018; Received: 04/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketJUDGMENT - SIGNED BY COURT TO COUNTY CLERK (Motion #02); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/05/2018; Received: 04/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #02) Additional Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 11/29/2017; Received: 11/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #02) Certificate of Merit; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 11/29/2017; Received: 11/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #02) Military Status Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 11/29/2017; Received: 11/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #02) Power of Attorney; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 11/29/2017; Received: 11/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #01) Proposed Order of Reference; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 09/07/2017; Received: 09/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 07/13/2017; Received: 07/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Additional Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 07/12/2017; Received: 07/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Western District Process Service, LLC; Filed: 07/02/2017; Received: 07/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Western District Process Service, LLC; Filed: 06/18/2017; Received: 06/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Western District Process Service, LLC; Filed: 06/18/2017; Received: 06/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 05/01/2017; Received: 05/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 05/01/2017; Received: 05/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 05/01/2017; Received: 05/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 05/01/2017; Received: 05/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less