This case was last updated from Richmond County Courts on 06/28/2020 at 04:00:00 (UTC).

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB, DOING BUSINESS AS CHRISTIANA TRUST, NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS LEGAL TITLE TRUSTEE FOR BRONZE CREEK TITLE TRUST 2013-NPL1 - v. - THERESA VIRGINIA BURGRESS et al

Case Summary

On 06/27/2017 WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB, DOING BUSINESS AS CHRISTIANA TRUST, NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS LEGAL TITLE TRUSTEE FOR BRONZE CREEK TITLE TRUST 2013-NPL1 filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against THERESA VIRGINIA BURGRESS. This case was filed in Richmond County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Richmond County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB, DOING BUSINESS AS CHRISTIANA TRUST, NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS LEGAL TITLE TRUSTEE FOR BRONZE CREEK TITLE TRUST 2013-NPL1

Defendants

Theresa virginia Burgress A/K/A THERESA VIRGINIA BURGESS AS PURPORTED HEIR AND DISTRIBUTEE OF THE ESTATE OF ETTA MILES A/K/A ETTA V. MILES

NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE

SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

Carolyn cordelia Miles brown AS PURPORTED HEIR AND DISTRIBUTEE OF THE ESTATE OF ETTA MILES A/K/A ETTA V. MILES

John Doe NUMBER ONE THROUGH JOHN DOE NUMBER TEN

NEW YORK CITY PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU

Not Yet Classified

Carolyn C Miles MILES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ZAMENHOF, ALEX

Attorney at Knuckles Komosinski & Manfro

LEVITHAN, LOUIS ANTHONY

Attorney at Knuckles, Komosinski, & Manfro, LLP

CARTY, LORETTA

Attorney at CIT Group Inc.

KOMOSINSKI, RICHARD F

Attorney at KNUCKLES, KOMOSINSKI, & MANFRO, LLP.

FITZGERALD, ERINA

Attorney at Knuckles, Komosinski & Manfro, LLP

Defendant and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

MAKELELE, MIALI ALBERT

Miles, Carolyn C

 

Court Documents

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Chambers about BK stay being lifted

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Chambers about BK stay being lifted; Filed By: Levithan, L.; Filed: 10/24/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Fitzgerald, E.; Filed: 08/23/2019; Received: 08/23/2019

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Services for Letter to Judge Desmond Green Re: Judgment, Motion and Stay

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Services for Letter to Judge Desmond Green Re: Judgment, Motion and Stay; Filed By: Miles, C. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Judge Desmond Green Re: Judgment, Motion and Stay

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Judge Desmond Green Re: Judgment, Motion and Stay; Filed By: Miles, C. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS April 10, 2019 Transcript.

TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS April 10, 2019 Transcript.; Filed By: Levithan, L.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Levithan, L.; Filed: 06/21/2019; Received: 06/21/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Court regarding Etta Miles' bankruptcy dismissal

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Court regarding Etta Miles' bankruptcy dismissal; Filed By: Levithan, L.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Levithan, L.; Filed: 04/12/2019; Received: 04/12/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #003) Affirmation of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #003) Affirmation of Service; Filed By: Zamenhof, A.; Filed: 04/09/2019; Received: 04/09/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS THERESA VIRGINIA BURGRESS - HEIR & DISTRIBUTEE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS THERESA VIRGINIA BURGRESS - HEIR & DISTRIBUTEE; Filed By: Komosinski, R. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 07/26/2017; Received: 07/26/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - F Exhibit F

EXHIBIT(S) - F Exhibit F; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - E Exhibit E

EXHIBIT(S) - E Exhibit E; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - D Exhibit D

EXHIBIT(S) - D Exhibit D; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit C

EXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit C; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B

EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

88 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Chambers about BK stay being lifted; Filed By: Levithan, L.; Filed: 10/24/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Fitzgerald, E.; Filed: 08/23/2019; Received: 08/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Services for Letter to Judge Desmond Green Re: Judgment, Motion and Stay; Filed By: Miles, C. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Judge Desmond Green Re: Judgment, Motion and Stay; Filed By: Miles, C. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS April 10, 2019 Transcript.; Filed By: Levithan, L.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Levithan, L.; Filed: 06/21/2019; Received: 06/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Court regarding Etta Miles' bankruptcy dismissal; Filed By: Levithan, L.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Levithan, L.; Filed: 04/12/2019; Received: 04/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #003) Affirmation of Service; Filed By: Zamenhof, A.; Filed: 04/09/2019; Received: 04/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #003) Affirmation in Further Support and in Reply to Defendant's Opposition; Filed By: Zamenhof, A.; Filed: 04/09/2019; Received: 04/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
80 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS SEC HUD; Filed By: Komosinski, R. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 07/26/2017; Received: 07/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS THERESA VIRGINIA BURGRESS - HEIR & DISTRIBUTEE; Filed By: Komosinski, R. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 07/26/2017; Received: 07/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F Exhibit F; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E Exhibit E; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Exhibit D; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit C; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less