This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/12/2020 at 10:19:32 (UTC).

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB, DBA CHRISTIANA TRUST, AS TRUSTEE FOR NORMANDY MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST, SERIES 2016-1 v. DORIS EDWARDS et al

Case Summary

On 05/17/2017 WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB, DBA CHRISTIANA TRUST, AS TRUSTEE FOR NORMANDY MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST, SERIES 2016-1 filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against DORIS EDWARDS. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB, DBA CHRISTIANA TRUST, AS TRUSTEE FOR NORMANDY MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST, SERIES 2016-1

Defendants

'JOHN DOE #1'

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC AS NOMINEE FOR 1ST REPUBLIC MORTGAGE BANKERS, INC

313A PULASKI HOLDING CORP.

CITY OF NEW YORK ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA OBO INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE

'JOHN DOE #2'

Doris Edwards

'JOHN DOE #3'

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

May, Ted E

Attorney at Sheldon May & Associates PC

MAY, TED ERIC

Attorney at SHELDON MAY & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

Defendant Attorneys

GRAHAM, HENRY MARTIN

Attorney at Cooper Paroff & Graham, P.C.

COOPER, IRA G.

Attorney at IRA G. COOPER

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT(S) - A-B (Motion #5) A-B

EXHIBIT(S) - A-B (Motion #5) A-B; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/21/2020; Received: 01/21/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #5) AFF IN SUPPORT

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #5) AFF IN SUPPORT; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/21/2020; Received: 01/21/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #5) AOS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #5) AOS; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/21/2020; Received: 01/21/2020

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #5) ORDER TO DISCONT

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #5) ORDER TO DISCONT; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/21/2020; Received: 01/21/2020

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #5) MOTION

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #5) MOTION; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/21/2020; Received: 01/21/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 12/11/2019; Received: 12/11/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE LETTER TO WITHDRAW SO ORDER

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE LETTER TO WITHDRAW SO ORDER; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 12/11/2019; Received: 12/11/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #4) AOS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #4) AOS; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 11/11/2019; Received: 11/11/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #4) AMENDED MOTION

NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #4) AMENDED MOTION; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 11/11/2019; Received: 11/11/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 313A PULASKI HOLDING CORP.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 313A PULASKI HOLDING CORP.; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 05/26/2017; Received: 05/26/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY (AMENDED)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY (AMENDED); Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

COMPLAINT (AMENDED)

COMPLAINT (AMENDED); Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

SUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED)

SUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED); Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 05/17/2017; Received: 05/17/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 05/17/2017; Received: 05/17/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 05/17/2017; Received: 05/17/2017

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 05/17/2017; Received: 05/17/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 05/17/2017; Received: 05/17/2017

79 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A-B (Motion #5) A-B; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/21/2020; Received: 01/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #5) AFF IN SUPPORT; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/21/2020; Received: 01/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #5) AOS; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/21/2020; Received: 01/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #5) ORDER TO DISCONT; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/21/2020; Received: 01/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #5) MOTION; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/21/2020; Received: 01/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 12/11/2019; Received: 12/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE LETTER TO WITHDRAW SO ORDER; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 12/11/2019; Received: 12/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #4) AOS; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 11/11/2019; Received: 11/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #4) AMENDED MOTION; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 11/11/2019; Received: 11/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A-R (Motion #4) A-R; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 11/06/2019; Received: 11/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
71 More Docket Entries
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA OBO INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE MAILING; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 313A PULASKI HOLDING CORP.; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 05/26/2017; Received: 05/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY (AMENDED); Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (AMENDED); Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED); Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 05/17/2017; Received: 05/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 05/17/2017; Received: 05/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 05/17/2017; Received: 05/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 05/17/2017; Received: 05/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 05/17/2017; Received: 05/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less