This case was last updated from Cortland County Courts on 03/20/2020 at 22:38:48 (UTC).

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB, AS TRUSTEE OF UPLAND MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST A v. ROGER STANDISH et al

Case Summary

On 11/22/2019 WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB, AS TRUSTEE OF UPLAND MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST A filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ROGER STANDISH. This case was filed in Cortland County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1397

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Cortland, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB, AS TRUSTEE OF UPLAND MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST A

Defendants

NIAGARA MOHAWK POWER CORP DBA NATIONAL GRID

RIEHLMAN & SHAFER LLC DBA RIEHLMAN SHAFER AND SHAFER

Roger Standish A/K/A ROGER D. STANDISH

ST. JOSEPHS HOSPITAL HEALTH CENTER

Craig L. Standish CO-ADMINISTRATOR CTA OF THE ESTATE OF BARBARA A. STANDISH A/K/A BARBARA STANDISH

JOHN DOE NUMBERS 1-10

E & V ENERGY CORPORATION

CHASE BANK USA, NA

Terry A. Standish CO-ADMINISTRATOR CTA OF THE ESTATE OF BARBARA A. STANDISH A/K/A BARBARA STANDISH

CORTLAND REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER F/K/A CORTLAND MEMORIAL HOSPITAL

Bonnie Standish A/K/A BONNIE G. STANDISH A/K/A BONNIE BUSH A/K/A BONNIE G. BUSH

NBT BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KOSTERICH, JEFFREY

Attorney at JEFFREY A. KOSTERICH, LLC

SINGH-SKEETE, DENISE

Attorney at Kosterich & Skeete, LLC

 

Court Documents

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT Returned Mail

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT Returned Mail; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/20/2020; Received: 02/20/2020

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT Notes regarding returned mail

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT Notes regarding returned mail; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

NOTICE RETURNED (UNDELIVERABLE)

NOTICE RETURNED (UNDELIVERABLE); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/22/2020; Received: 01/22/2020

NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

ASSIGNED RJI

ASSIGNED RJI; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Singh-Skeete, D.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Singh-Skeete, D.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Singh-Skeete, D.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Singh-Skeete, D. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CHASE BANK

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CHASE BANK; Filed By: Singh-Skeete, D. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Kosterich, J.; Filed: 11/22/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Kosterich, J.; Filed: 11/22/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D SURROGATES COURT DOCS, LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION, DEED

EXHIBIT(S) - D SURROGATES COURT DOCS, LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION, DEED; Filed By: Kosterich, J.; Filed: 11/22/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C 30 DAY DEMAND LETTERS, 90 DAY DEMAND LETTERS, NYS REGISTRATION, AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - C 30 DAY DEMAND LETTERS, 90 DAY DEMAND LETTERS, NYS REGISTRATION, AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Kosterich, J.; Filed: 11/22/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B NOTE, ALLONGES, MORTGAGE, ASSIGNMENTS OF MORTGAGE, MODIFIED PAYMENT AGREEMENT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - B NOTE, ALLONGES, MORTGAGE, ASSIGNMENTS OF MORTGAGE, MODIFIED PAYMENT AGREEMENT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Kosterich, J.; Filed: 11/22/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A PARTIES OF INTEREST

EXHIBIT(S) - A PARTIES OF INTEREST; Filed By: Kosterich, J.; Filed: 11/22/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Kosterich, J.; Filed: 11/22/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT Returned Mail; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/20/2020; Received: 02/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT Notes regarding returned mail; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE RETURNED (UNDELIVERABLE); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/22/2020; Received: 01/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketASSIGNED RJI; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Singh-Skeete, D.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Singh-Skeete, D.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Singh-Skeete, D.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Singh-Skeete, D.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CRAIG L STANDISH, CO-ADMIN; Filed By: Singh-Skeete, D. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 12/12/2019; Received: 12/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Singh-Skeete, D. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CHASE BANK; Filed By: Singh-Skeete, D. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Kosterich, J.; Filed: 11/22/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Kosterich, J.; Filed: 11/22/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D SURROGATES COURT DOCS, LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION, DEED; Filed By: Kosterich, J.; Filed: 11/22/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C 30 DAY DEMAND LETTERS, 90 DAY DEMAND LETTERS, NYS REGISTRATION, AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Kosterich, J.; Filed: 11/22/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B NOTE, ALLONGES, MORTGAGE, ASSIGNMENTS OF MORTGAGE, MODIFIED PAYMENT AGREEMENT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Kosterich, J.; Filed: 11/22/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A PARTIES OF INTEREST; Filed By: Kosterich, J.; Filed: 11/22/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Kosterich, J.; Filed: 11/22/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less