This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 04/29/2020 at 14:33:51 (UTC).

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB, AS TRUSTEE OF STANWICH MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST A - v. - KEVIN M. DUQUETTE et al

Case Summary

On 05/02/2018 WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB, AS TRUSTEE OF STANWICH MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST A filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against KEVIN M DUQUETTE. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2018

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB

Defendants

Internal Revenue service United states of america, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA - INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE

Kevin M. Duquette

Lisa F. Duquette

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BRENNAN, JENNIFER R.

SHERER, JOSHUA ALAN

Roach, Peter

Defendant Attorney

MOAR, DANIEL B

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #2) Notice of Entry

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #2) Notice of Entry; Filed By: Brennan, J.; Filed: 07/31/2019; Received: 07/31/2019

NOTICE OF SALE Notice of Sale

NOTICE OF SALE Notice of Sale; Filed By: Brennan, J.; Filed: 07/31/2019; Received: 07/31/2019

ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE

ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

BILL OF COSTS Clerk stamp

BILL OF COSTS Clerk stamp; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/17/2019; Received: 07/17/2019

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

OATH

OATH; Filed By: Brennan, J.; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2); Filed By: Brennan, J.; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2)

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2); Filed By: Brennan, J.; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Roach, P. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 05/16/2018; Received: 05/16/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING - KEVIN M. DUQUETTE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING - KEVIN M. DUQUETTE; Filed By: Roach, P. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 05/16/2018; Received: 05/16/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - C ASSIGNMENT

EXHIBIT(S) - C ASSIGNMENT; Filed By: Sherer, J.; Filed: 05/02/2018; Received: 05/02/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B MORTGAGE

EXHIBIT(S) - B MORTGAGE; Filed By: Sherer, J.; Filed: 05/02/2018; Received: 05/02/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A NOTE

EXHIBIT(S) - A NOTE; Filed By: Sherer, J.; Filed: 05/02/2018; Received: 05/02/2018

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Sherer, J.; Filed: 05/02/2018; Received: 05/02/2018

CONSENT TO EFILING CONSENT TO EFILING

CONSENT TO EFILING CONSENT TO EFILING; Filed By: Sherer, J.; Filed: 05/02/2018; Received: 05/02/2018

NOTICE OF PENDENCY NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Sherer, J.; Filed: 05/02/2018; Received: 05/02/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; Filed By: Sherer, J.; Filed: 05/02/2018; Received: 05/02/2018

61 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #2) Notice of Entry; Filed By: Brennan, J.; Filed: 07/31/2019; Received: 07/31/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SALE Notice of Sale; Filed By: Brennan, J.; Filed: 07/31/2019; Received: 07/31/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF COSTS Clerk stamp; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/17/2019; Received: 07/17/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOATH; Filed By: Brennan, J.; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2); Filed By: Brennan, J.; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2); Filed By: Brennan, J.; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF COSTS (Motion #2); Filed By: Brennan, J.; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 05/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Roach, P. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 05/16/2018; Received: 05/16/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Roach, P. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 05/16/2018; Received: 05/16/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING - KEVIN M. DUQUETTE; Filed By: Roach, P. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 05/16/2018; Received: 05/16/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C ASSIGNMENT; Filed By: Sherer, J.; Filed: 05/02/2018; Received: 05/02/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B MORTGAGE; Filed By: Sherer, J.; Filed: 05/02/2018; Received: 05/02/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A NOTE; Filed By: Sherer, J.; Filed: 05/02/2018; Received: 05/02/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Sherer, J.; Filed: 05/02/2018; Received: 05/02/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO EFILING CONSENT TO EFILING; Filed By: Sherer, J.; Filed: 05/02/2018; Received: 05/02/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Sherer, J.; Filed: 05/02/2018; Received: 05/02/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; Filed By: Sherer, J.; Filed: 05/02/2018; Received: 05/02/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less