This case was last updated from Westchester County Courts on 02/08/2020 at 01:52:58 (UTC).

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB, AS TRUSTEE OF STANWICH MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST A - v. - JUSTA C. LUJWANGANA et al

Case Summary

On 04/28/2017 WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB, AS TRUSTEE OF STANWICH MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST A filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against JUSTA C LUJWANGANA. This case was filed in Westchester County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2017

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Westchester County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Westchester, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB, AS TRUSTEE OF STANWICH MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST A

Defendants

Justa C. Lujwangana

Margaret Davis

PETRO INC.

John Doe xx

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HENRY, TIFFANY LAJUNE

Attorney at THE MARGOLIN & WEINREB LAW GROUP, LLP

KATZ, JORDAN S

Attorney at JORDAN S. KATZ AND ASSOCIATES, PC

WEBER-CANTRELL, JACLYN ANN

Attorney at Aldridge Pite, LLP

NIERER, CYNTHIA ANNE

Attorney at The Margolin & Weinreb Law Group, LLP

SHEEHAN, KENNETH M

Attorney at Aldridge Pite, LLP

Defendant Attorney

D'ORO, ATTILIO A.

Attorney at Nicoletti Gonson Spinner & Owen LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE Notice of Appeal

NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE Notice of Appeal; Filed By: Henry, T.; Filed: 10/21/2019; Received: 10/21/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry with Affidavit of Service

NOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry with Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 10/21/2019; Received: 10/21/2019

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #2)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/20/2018; Received: 12/19/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #2)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #2); Filed By: D'Oro, A.; Filed: 10/13/2018; Received: 10/13/2018

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: D'Oro, A.; Filed: 10/09/2018; Received: 10/09/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #2) Decision, aff of mail and legal back

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #2) Decision, aff of mail and legal back; Filed By: Sheehan, K.; Filed: 10/05/2018; Received: 10/05/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #2) mortgage

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #2) mortgage; Filed By: Sheehan, K.; Filed: 10/05/2018; Received: 10/05/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #2) 90 day

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #2) 90 day; Filed By: Sheehan, K.; Filed: 10/05/2018; Received: 10/05/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #2) Affirmation in Opposition

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #2) Affirmation in Opposition; Filed By: Sheehan, K.; Filed: 10/05/2018; Received: 10/05/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE John Doe

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE John Doe; Filed By: Lanza, C.; Filed: 06/09/2017; Received: 06/09/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Occupants

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Occupants; Filed By: Lanza, C.; Filed: 06/09/2017; Received: 06/09/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Margaret Davis

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Margaret Davis; Filed By: Lanza, C.; Filed: 06/09/2017; Received: 06/09/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Jogn Doe

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Jogn Doe; Filed By: Lanza, C.; Filed: 06/09/2017; Received: 06/09/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Petro Inc

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Petro Inc; Filed By: Lanza, C.; Filed: 06/09/2017; Received: 06/09/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Justa C. Lujwangana

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Justa C. Lujwangana; Filed By: Lanza, C.; Filed: 06/09/2017; Received: 06/09/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service through the Secretary of State

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service through the Secretary of State; Filed By: Lanza, C.; Filed: 06/09/2017; Received: 06/09/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Lanza, C.; Filed: 04/28/2017; Received: 04/28/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Lanza, C.; Filed: 04/28/2017; Received: 04/28/2017

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE Notice of Appeal; Filed By: Henry, T.; Filed: 10/21/2019; Received: 10/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry with Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Nierer, C.; Filed: 10/21/2019; Received: 10/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/20/2018; Received: 12/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #2); Filed By: D'Oro, A.; Filed: 10/13/2018; Received: 10/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: D'Oro, A.; Filed: 10/09/2018; Received: 10/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #2) Decision, aff of mail and legal back; Filed By: Sheehan, K.; Filed: 10/05/2018; Received: 10/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #2) mortgage; Filed By: Sheehan, K.; Filed: 10/05/2018; Received: 10/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #2) 90 day; Filed By: Sheehan, K.; Filed: 10/05/2018; Received: 10/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #2) Affirmation in Opposition; Filed By: Sheehan, K.; Filed: 10/05/2018; Received: 10/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) Note of Issue; Filed By: D'Oro, A.; Filed: 09/05/2018; Received: 09/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S); Filed By: D'Oro, A.; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE John Doe; Filed By: Lanza, C.; Filed: 06/09/2017; Received: 06/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Occupants; Filed By: Lanza, C.; Filed: 06/09/2017; Received: 06/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Margaret Davis; Filed By: Lanza, C.; Filed: 06/09/2017; Received: 06/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Jogn Doe; Filed By: Lanza, C.; Filed: 06/09/2017; Received: 06/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Petro Inc; Filed By: Lanza, C.; Filed: 06/09/2017; Received: 06/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Justa C. Lujwangana; Filed By: Lanza, C.; Filed: 06/09/2017; Received: 06/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service through the Secretary of State; Filed By: Lanza, C.; Filed: 06/09/2017; Received: 06/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Lanza, C.; Filed: 04/28/2017; Received: 04/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Lanza, C.; Filed: 04/28/2017; Received: 04/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less