This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 02/27/2020 at 00:20:33 (UTC).

WILLIAMS MASON v. THE CITY OF NEW YORK et al

Case Summary

On 04/23/2019 WILLIAMS MASON filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against THE CITY OF NEW YORK. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Mitchell J Danziger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******019E

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Court:

    Bronx County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Mitchell J Danziger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Williams Mason

Defendants

John Does CORRECTION OFFICERS

THE NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS CORRECTION OFFICER LEWIS (Shield No. 10536)

John Roes CORRECTION OFFICER (Correction Officers whose names are not yet known or identified)

THE CITY OF NEW YORK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZEICHNER, JEFFREY

Attorney at JEFFREY ZEICHNER, ATTORNEY AT LAW

Defendant Attorney

DOORGA, ANYA KODIJA

Attorney at New York City Law Department

 

Court Documents

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER & ORDER & SIGNED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE DATED 6/13/2019

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER & ORDER & SIGNED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE DATED 6/13/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/26/2019; Received: 06/26/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) PROPOSED STP

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) PROPOSED STP; Filed By: Doorga, A.; Filed: 06/12/2019; Received: 06/12/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; Filed By: Doorga, A.; Filed: 06/12/2019; Received: 06/12/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) STIP OF INCAR

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) STIP OF INCAR; Filed By: Doorga, A.; Filed: 06/12/2019; Received: 06/12/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) NOC

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) NOC; Filed By: Doorga, A.; Filed: 06/12/2019; Received: 06/12/2019

AFFIRMATION (Motion #001)

AFFIRMATION (Motion #001); Filed By: Doorga, A.; Filed: 06/12/2019; Received: 06/12/2019

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001)

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Doorga, A.; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/05/2019

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001)

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001); Filed By: Zeichner, J.; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) PROPOSED ORDER

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) PROPOSED ORDER; Filed By: Zeichner, J.; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) NYS INMATE INFORMATION

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) NYS INMATE INFORMATION; Filed By: Zeichner, J.; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) STIPULATION

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) STIPULATION; Filed By: Zeichner, J.; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; Filed By: Zeichner, J.; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #001); Filed By: Zeichner, J.; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001); Filed By: Zeichner, J.; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Zeichner, J.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER & ORDER & SIGNED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE DATED 6/13/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/26/2019; Received: 06/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) PROPOSED STP; Filed By: Doorga, A.; Filed: 06/12/2019; Received: 06/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; Filed By: Doorga, A.; Filed: 06/12/2019; Received: 06/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) STIP OF INCAR; Filed By: Doorga, A.; Filed: 06/12/2019; Received: 06/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) NOC; Filed By: Doorga, A.; Filed: 06/12/2019; Received: 06/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #001); Filed By: Doorga, A.; Filed: 06/12/2019; Received: 06/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Doorga, A.; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001); Filed By: Zeichner, J.; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) PROPOSED ORDER; Filed By: Zeichner, J.; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) NYS INMATE INFORMATION; Filed By: Zeichner, J.; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) STIPULATION; Filed By: Zeichner, J.; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; Filed By: Zeichner, J.; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #001); Filed By: Zeichner, J.; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001); Filed By: Zeichner, J.; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Zeichner, J.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less