This case was last updated from Essex County Courts on 03/24/2020 at 19:35:51 (UTC).

William T. McCutcheon - v. - The Town of Westport

Case Summary

On 07/28/2017 William T McCutcheon filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against The Town of Westport. This case was filed in Essex County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0333

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Essex, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

William T Mccutcheon

Defendant

WESTPORT TOWN OF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DENNIN, GREGORY M.

Attorney at DENNIN & DENNIN

Defendant Attorney

TEDFORD, DANIEL THOMAS

Attorney at Essex County Attorney's Office

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Tedford, D.; Filed: 03/20/2020; Received: 03/20/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) 11-01-2019 letter

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) 11-01-2019 letter; Filed By: Dennin, G.; Filed: 03/12/2020; Received: 03/12/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) 10-02-2019 letter

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) 10-02-2019 letter; Filed By: Dennin, G.; Filed: 03/12/2020; Received: 03/12/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) 2015 order and judgment

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) 2015 order and judgment; Filed By: Dennin, G.; Filed: 03/12/2020; Received: 03/12/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #2)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Dennin, G.; Filed: 03/12/2020; Received: 03/12/2020

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Dennin, G.; Filed: 03/12/2020; Received: 03/12/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) affidavit of service by mail

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) affidavit of service by mail; Filed By: Dennin, G.; Filed: 08/17/2017; Received: 08/17/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) affidavit of personal service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) affidavit of personal service; Filed By: Dennin, G.; Filed: 08/17/2017; Received: 08/17/2017

NOTICE

NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/02/2017; Received: 08/02/2017

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION; Filed By: Dennin, G.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1); Filed By: Dennin, G.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B Authorization form to Petition

EXHIBIT(S) - B Authorization form to Petition; Filed By: Dennin, G.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A Schedule A to Petition

EXHIBIT(S) - A Schedule A to Petition; Filed By: Dennin, G.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

PETITION

PETITION; Filed By: Dennin, G.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Tedford, D.; Filed: 03/20/2020; Received: 03/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) 11-01-2019 letter; Filed By: Dennin, G.; Filed: 03/12/2020; Received: 03/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) 10-02-2019 letter; Filed By: Dennin, G.; Filed: 03/12/2020; Received: 03/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) 2015 order and judgment; Filed By: Dennin, G.; Filed: 03/12/2020; Received: 03/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Dennin, G.; Filed: 03/12/2020; Received: 03/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Dennin, G.; Filed: 03/12/2020; Received: 03/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) affidavit of service by mail; Filed By: Dennin, G.; Filed: 08/17/2017; Received: 08/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) affidavit of personal service; Filed By: Dennin, G.; Filed: 08/17/2017; Received: 08/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/02/2017; Received: 08/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION; Filed By: Dennin, G.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1); Filed By: Dennin, G.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Authorization form to Petition; Filed By: Dennin, G.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Schedule A to Petition; Filed By: Dennin, G.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION; Filed By: Dennin, G.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less