Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/23/2020 at 20:21:46 (UTC).

WILLIAM O'DONNELL v. ROCKLYN ECCLESIASTICAL CORP. et al

Case Summary

On 03/12/2019 WILLIAM O'DONNELL filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ROCKLYN ECCLESIASTICAL CORP. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

William O'donnell

Defendants

THE CITY OF NEW YORK

ROCKLYN ECCLESIASTICAL CORP.

NAVILLUS TILE, INC.

NEW YORK CITY SCHOOL CONSTRUCTION AUTHORITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EPSTEIN, MARK JAY

Defendant Attorneys

LAWLOR, WILLIAM CODY

Attorney at Hannum Feretic Prendergast & Merlino, LLC

SCAHILL, FRANCIS J

Attorney at PICCIANO & SCAHILL, P.C.

 

Court Documents

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Order Dated 10/22/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Order Dated 10/22/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 11/21/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Scahill, F.; Filed: 09/19/2019; Received: 09/19/2019

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Scahill, F.; Filed: 09/19/2019; Received: 09/19/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Lawlor, W.; Filed: 06/10/2019; Received: 06/10/2019

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation Extending Time to Answer

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation Extending Time to Answer; Filed By: Lawlor, W.; Filed: 05/14/2019; Received: 05/14/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service The City of New York

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service The City of New York; Filed By: Epstein, M.; Filed: 05/13/2019; Received: 05/13/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Scahill, F.; Filed: 05/09/2019; Received: 05/09/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service for Navillus Tile, Inc.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service for Navillus Tile, Inc.; Filed By: Epstein, M.; Filed: 05/01/2019; Received: 05/01/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service New York City School Construction Authority

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service New York City School Construction Authority; Filed By: Epstein, M.; Filed: 05/01/2019; Received: 05/01/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service for Rockland Ecclesiastical Corp.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service for Rockland Ecclesiastical Corp.; Filed By: Epstein, M.; Filed: 05/01/2019; Received: 05/01/2019

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer; Filed By: Lawlor, W.; Filed: 04/15/2019; Received: 04/15/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT V. Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT V. Complaint; Filed By: Epstein, M.; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Order Dated 10/22/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 11/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Scahill, F.; Filed: 09/19/2019; Received: 09/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Scahill, F.; Filed: 09/19/2019; Received: 09/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Lawlor, W.; Filed: 06/10/2019; Received: 06/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation Extending Time to Answer; Filed By: Lawlor, W.; Filed: 05/14/2019; Received: 05/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service The City of New York; Filed By: Epstein, M.; Filed: 05/13/2019; Received: 05/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Scahill, F.; Filed: 05/09/2019; Received: 05/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service for Navillus Tile, Inc.; Filed By: Epstein, M.; Filed: 05/01/2019; Received: 05/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service New York City School Construction Authority; Filed By: Epstein, M.; Filed: 05/01/2019; Received: 05/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service for Rockland Ecclesiastical Corp.; Filed By: Epstein, M.; Filed: 05/01/2019; Received: 05/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer; Filed By: Lawlor, W.; Filed: 04/15/2019; Received: 04/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT V. Complaint; Filed By: Epstein, M.; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less