This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 02:14:26 (UTC).

William Marsano - v. - City of New York et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 William Marsano filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against City of New York. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

William Marsano

Defendants

City of New York

Esther Schwartz

Michael Fried

Ada Wisniewski

Joseph Schwartz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DONUK, AYBIKE

Attorney at Cellino & Barnes, P.C.

SHIELDS, JOHN HUGGARD

Attorney at Cellino & Barnes, PC

Defendant Attorneys

Counsel, Corporation

Attorney at New York City Corporation Counsel

LAWRENCE, KRIS E.

Attorney at MURA & STORM, PLLC

DEGENNARO-LABBE, ANDREW ANTHONY

Attorney at Groelle & Salmon P.A.

KREJCI, ERIC T.

Attorney at CLAUSEN MILLER P.C.

NETT, JOSEPH ALBERT

Attorney at Brand & Tapply, LLC

 

Court Documents

ORDER - OTHER dtd 8/13/2019

ORDER - OTHER dtd 8/13/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/22/2019; Received: 08/28/2019

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Krejci, E.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Krejci, E.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

ORDER - OTHER

ORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/04/2019; Received: 02/07/2019

ORDER - OTHER dated 5/22/18

ORDER - OTHER dated 5/22/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/25/2018; Received: 05/31/2018

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 12/18/2017

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 12/18/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/20/2017; Received: 01/29/2018

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Donuk, A.; Filed: 10/17/2017; Received: 10/17/2017

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Nett, J.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Answer and Affirmative Defenses and Crossclaims

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Answer and Affirmative Defenses and Crossclaims; Filed By: Nett, J.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Shields, J. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Shields, J. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/20/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Shields, J. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/20/2017

CONSENT TO EFILING

CONSENT TO EFILING; Filed By: Shields, J.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

CONSENT TO EFILING

CONSENT TO EFILING; Filed By: Shields, J.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

CONSENT TO EFILING

CONSENT TO EFILING; Filed By: Shields, J.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

CONSENT TO EFILING

CONSENT TO EFILING; Filed By: Shields, J.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

CONSENT TO EFILING

CONSENT TO EFILING; Filed By: Shields, J.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Shields, J.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER dtd 8/13/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/22/2019; Received: 08/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Krejci, E.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Krejci, E.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/04/2019; Received: 02/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER dated 5/22/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/25/2018; Received: 05/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 12/18/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/20/2017; Received: 01/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Donuk, A.; Filed: 10/17/2017; Received: 10/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Nett, J.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Answer and Affirmative Defenses and Crossclaims; Filed By: Nett, J.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Lawrence, K.; Filed: 07/11/2017; Received: 07/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Shields, J. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Shields, J. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Shields, J. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Shields, J. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO EFILING; Filed By: Shields, J.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO EFILING; Filed By: Shields, J.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO EFILING; Filed By: Shields, J.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO EFILING; Filed By: Shields, J.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO EFILING; Filed By: Shields, J.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Shields, J.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less