This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 02/24/2020 at 15:17:57 (UTC).

WILLIAM JACKSON et al v. NEW YORK CONVENTION CENTER OPERATING CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 03/25/2019 WILLIAM JACKSON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against NEW YORK CONVENTION CENTER OPERATING CORPORATION. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is David B Cohen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

Judge Details

Judge

David B Cohen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

William Jackson

Margaret Jackson

Defendants

TURNER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

EMPIRE STATE DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION

LENDLEASE TURNER A JOINT VENTURE

NEW YORK CONVENTION CENTER DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION

JACOB K. JAVITS CONVENTION CENTER OF NEW YORK

NEW YORK CONVENTION CENTER OPERATING CORPORATION

LENDLEASE (US) CONSTRUCTION LMB INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ROBERTS, RICHARD BRUCE

Attorney at SACKS & SACKS, LLP

SACKS, KENNETH

Attorney at SACKS & SACKS

Defendant Attorneys

SPARLING, JOHN E

Attorney at Cullen and Dykman LLP

RIVERA, JENNESSY ANGIE

Attorney at CULLEN & DYKMAN LLP

GABAI, NADINE

Attorney at Cullen and Dykman LLP

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #001) ACTION NO. 2 ANSWER

EXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #001) ACTION NO. 2 ANSWER; Filed By: Roberts, R.; Filed: 02/08/2020; Received: 02/08/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #001) EXHIBIT 5-ACTION NO. 2 S&C-AOS

EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #001) EXHIBIT 5-ACTION NO. 2 S&C-AOS; Filed By: Roberts, R.; Filed: 02/08/2020; Received: 02/08/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #001) EXHIBIT 4-C. CONF

EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #001) EXHIBIT 4-C. CONF; Filed By: Roberts, R.; Filed: 02/08/2020; Received: 02/08/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #001) EXHIBIT 3-ACTION NO. 1 PC ORDER

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #001) EXHIBIT 3-ACTION NO. 1 PC ORDER; Filed By: Roberts, R.; Filed: 02/08/2020; Received: 02/08/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #001) EXHIBIT 2-ACTION NO. 1 ANSWER

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #001) EXHIBIT 2-ACTION NO. 1 ANSWER; Filed By: Roberts, R.; Filed: 02/08/2020; Received: 02/08/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) EXHIBIT 1-ACTION NO. 1 S&C-AOS

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) EXHIBIT 1-ACTION NO. 1 S&C-AOS; Filed By: Roberts, R.; Filed: 02/08/2020; Received: 02/08/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Roberts, R.; Filed: 02/08/2020; Received: 02/08/2020

AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #001)

AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #001); Filed By: Roberts, R.; Filed: 02/08/2020; Received: 02/08/2020

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Roberts, R.; Filed: 02/08/2020; Received: 02/08/2020

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Roberts, R.; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Preliminary Conference Request

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Preliminary Conference Request; Filed By: Roberts, R.; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

ADMISSION OF SERVICE

ADMISSION OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sacks, K.; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

ADMISSION OF SERVICE

ADMISSION OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sacks, K.; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

ADMISSION OF SERVICE

ADMISSION OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sacks, K.; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

ADMISSION OF SERVICE

ADMISSION OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sacks, K.; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE AOS to Answer

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE AOS to Answer; Filed By: Sparling, J.; Filed: 05/21/2019; Received: 05/21/2019

ANSWER Verified Answer

ANSWER Verified Answer; Filed By: Sparling, J.; Filed: 05/21/2019; Received: 05/21/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Verified Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Verified Complaint; Filed By: Roberts, R.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #001) ACTION NO. 2 ANSWER; Filed By: Roberts, R.; Filed: 02/08/2020; Received: 02/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #001) EXHIBIT 5-ACTION NO. 2 S&C-AOS; Filed By: Roberts, R.; Filed: 02/08/2020; Received: 02/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #001) EXHIBIT 4-C. CONF; Filed By: Roberts, R.; Filed: 02/08/2020; Received: 02/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #001) EXHIBIT 3-ACTION NO. 1 PC ORDER; Filed By: Roberts, R.; Filed: 02/08/2020; Received: 02/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #001) EXHIBIT 2-ACTION NO. 1 ANSWER; Filed By: Roberts, R.; Filed: 02/08/2020; Received: 02/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) EXHIBIT 1-ACTION NO. 1 S&C-AOS; Filed By: Roberts, R.; Filed: 02/08/2020; Received: 02/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Roberts, R.; Filed: 02/08/2020; Received: 02/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #001); Filed By: Roberts, R.; Filed: 02/08/2020; Received: 02/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Roberts, R.; Filed: 02/08/2020; Received: 02/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/11/2019; Received: 12/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Roberts, R.; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Roberts, R.; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Preliminary Conference Request; Filed By: Roberts, R.; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADMISSION OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sacks, K.; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADMISSION OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sacks, K.; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADMISSION OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sacks, K.; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADMISSION OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sacks, K.; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE AOS to Answer; Filed By: Sparling, J.; Filed: 05/21/2019; Received: 05/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer; Filed By: Sparling, J.; Filed: 05/21/2019; Received: 05/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Verified Complaint; Filed By: Roberts, R.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less