Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 06/24/2020 at 09:13:11 (UTC).

WILLIAM G STODOLSKI et al v. A.O. SMITH WATER PRODUCTS CO., et al

Case Summary

On 04/05/2019 WILLIAM G STODOLSKI filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against A O SMITH WATER PRODUCTS CO . This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judges overseeing this case are Leonard D Steinman and Jack Libert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

Judge Details

Judges

Leonard D Steinman

Jack Libert

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Claire Pisanti

Defendants

SLANT/FIN CORPORATION

HENNESSY INDUSTRIES, INC. Individually s/i/i AMMCO

GRINNELL LLC

GOULDS PUMPS LLC

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

U.S. RUBBER COMPANY (UNIROYAL),

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC., f/k/a ALLIED SIGNAL, INC. / BENDIX,

AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, s/b/m BUFFALO PUMPS, INC

CBS CORPORATION, f/k/a VIACOM INC., s/b/m CBS CORPORATION, f/k/a WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

GARDNER DENVER, INC

RHEEM MANUFACTURING COMPANY

KOHLER CO.,

ARVINMERITOR, INC., Individually and s/i/i ROCKWELL AUTOMOTIVE

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

FMC CORPORATION, o/b/o CHICAGO PUMP o/b/o NORTHERN PUMP BUSINESSES

AURORA PUMP COMPANY

DAIMLER TRUCKS NORTH AMERICA LLC, f/k/a FREIGHTLINER CORPORATION

AMCHEM PRODUCTS, INC., n/k/a RHONE POULENC AG COMPANY n/k/a BAYER CROPSCIENCE INC.,

Not Yet Classified

Nicoletti & Harris

22 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

GOLUB, NORMAN JULIUS

Attorney at Lucosky Brookman LLP

BYSTRITSKAYA, ALEXANDRA

Attorney at Aaronson Rappaport Feinstein & Deutsch, LLP

PENNIE, NANCY L

Attorney at AARONSON RAPPAPORT FEINSTEIN & DEUTSCH

PUGLIESE, DONALD R

Attorney at MCDERMOTT WILL & EMERY LLP

TANENBAUM, MICHAEL A

Attorney at Tanenbaum Keale LLP

CARNI, URIEL SHMAYA

Attorney at Segal McCambridge Singer & Mahoney Ltd.

PASCARELLA, LISA M.

Attorney at PASCARELLA DIVITA LINDENBAUM & TOMASZEWSKI

CHAUDHRI-DEWIT, SHAZIA

Attorney at HOAGLAND, LONGO, MORAN, DUNST & DOUKAS

DOWNEY, PATRICK F

Attorney at GORDON REES SCULLY MANSUKHANI, LLP

Not Yet Classified Attorney

KLEIN, GARY R

Attorney at WEITZ & LUXENBERG PC

Other Attorneys

O'ROURKE, PHILIP J

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

GOODEARL, DAVID JAMES

Attorney at LEADER BERKON COLAO & SILVERSTEIN LLP

HOLLMAN, LAURA B.

Attorney at ECKERT SEAMANS

DARCHE, BENJAMIN ALAN

CHEN, AMY YINGHONG

Attorney at Clyde & Co US LLP

WATT, LAUREN ALYSE

Attorney at Darger Errante Yavitz & Blau LLP

WEILL, ELIZABETH ANNE

Attorney at Goldberg Segalla LLP

PALMIOTTO, VINCENT JAMES

Attorney at CLYDE & CO

SARGENTE, ALFRED JOSEPH

Attorney at HAWKINS PARNELL & YOUNG, LLP

BLADEL, CHRISTOPHER BRIAN

Attorney at Eckert, Seamans, Cherin & Mellott, LLC

24 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY Velan Valve Corp. Notice of Entry

NOTICE OF ENTRY Velan Valve Corp. Notice of Entry; Filed By: Coughlan, T.; Filed: 06/19/2020; Received: 06/19/2020

ORDER - OTHER Order of Dismissal as to Defendant Velan Valve Corp.

ORDER - OTHER Order of Dismissal as to Defendant Velan Valve Corp.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/18/2020; Received: 06/18/2020

ORDER - OTHER so ordered stip disc

ORDER - OTHER so ordered stip disc; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/16/2020; Received: 06/12/2020

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Gasior, J.; Filed: 06/01/2020; Received: 06/01/2020

NOTICE OF ENTRY Flowserve's Notice of Entry and Filed Order of Dismissal

NOTICE OF ENTRY Flowserve's Notice of Entry and Filed Order of Dismissal; Filed By: Sorensen, B.; Filed: 06/01/2020; Received: 06/01/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #002) ArvinMeritor, Inc. filed SOD

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #002) ArvinMeritor, Inc. filed SOD; Filed By: Halbardier, S.; Filed: 06/01/2020; Received: 06/01/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) Plaintiff's redacted Interrogatories Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) Plaintiff's redacted Interrogatories Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Halbardier, S.; Filed: 06/01/2020; Received: 06/01/2020

ORDER - OTHER Order of Dismissal as to Pfizer, Inc.

ORDER - OTHER Order of Dismissal as to Pfizer, Inc.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/02/2020; Received: 06/01/2020

ORDER - OTHER Order of Dismissal as to Flowserve

ORDER - OTHER Order of Dismissal as to Flowserve; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/02/2020; Received: 06/01/2020

ANSWER Rheem's Answer to Plaintiff's Verified Complaint

ANSWER Rheem's Answer to Plaintiff's Verified Complaint; Filed By: Pascarella, L.; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Klein, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 04/19/2019; Received: 04/19/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Klein, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 04/19/2019; Received: 04/19/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Klein, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 04/19/2019; Received: 04/19/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Klein, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 04/19/2019; Received: 04/19/2019

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Darche, B.; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Darche, B.; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Darche, B.; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Darche, B.; Filed: 04/05/2019; Received: 04/05/2019

195 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY Velan Valve Corp. Notice of Entry; Filed By: Coughlan, T.; Filed: 06/19/2020; Received: 06/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER Order of Dismissal as to Defendant Velan Valve Corp.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/18/2020; Received: 06/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER so ordered stip disc; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/16/2020; Received: 06/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER Order of Dismissal as to Pfizer, Inc.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/02/2020; Received: 06/01/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER Order of Dismissal as to Flowserve; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/02/2020; Received: 06/01/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Gasior, J.; Filed: 06/01/2020; Received: 06/01/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY Flowserve's Notice of Entry and Filed Order of Dismissal; Filed By: Sorensen, B.; Filed: 06/01/2020; Received: 06/01/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #002) ArvinMeritor, Inc. filed SOD; Filed By: Halbardier, S.; Filed: 06/01/2020; Received: 06/01/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) Plaintiff's redacted Interrogatories Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Halbardier, S.; Filed: 06/01/2020; Received: 06/01/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) ArvinMeritor, Inc. filed Answer; Filed By: Halbardier, S.; Filed: 06/01/2020; Received: 06/01/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
190 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Darche, B.; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Rheem's Answer to Plaintiff's Verified Complaint; Filed By: Pascarella, L.; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Klein, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 04/19/2019; Received: 04/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Klein, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 04/19/2019; Received: 04/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Klein, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 04/19/2019; Received: 04/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Klein, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 04/19/2019; Received: 04/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Darche, B.; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Darche, B.; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Darche, B.; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Darche, B.; Filed: 04/05/2019; Received: 04/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less