This case was last updated from Onondaga County Courts on 06/03/2020 at 11:29:45 (UTC).

William F. Allen v. Murnane Building Contractors, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2018 William F Allen filed an Other lawsuit against Murnane Building Contractors, Inc. This case was filed in Onondaga County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Deborah H Karalunas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2018

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Onondaga, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Deborah H Karalunas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

William F. Allen

Defendants

Francis Cauffman (NY), LLP

Francis Cauffman, Inc.

Murnane Building Contractors, Inc.

Murnane Construction Services, Inc.

The Pike Company, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LA DIEU, HEATHER RENEE

Attorney at MEGGESTO CROSSETT & VALERINO LLP

Defendant Attorneys

FERRARA, PAUL GERARD

Attorney at COSTELLO, COONEY & FEARON, PLLC

HOFFMAN, ELIZABETH ANNE

Attorney at COSTELLO, COONEY & FEARON, PLLC

FLYNN, ROBERT HAROLD

Attorney at Lippman O'Connor

DAVOLI, MICHELLE M.

Attorney at Law Offices of John Wallace

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1); Filed By: Davoli, M.; Filed: 05/22/2020; Received: 05/22/2020

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1) *Corrected*

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1) *Corrected*; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/22/2020; Received: 05/22/2020

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: La Dieu, H.; Filed: 05/20/2020; Received: 05/20/2020

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/19/2020; Received: 05/18/2020

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #2)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/23/2020; Received: 04/23/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: La Dieu, H.; Filed: 03/19/2020; Received: 03/19/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION (Motion #2)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Davoli, M.; Filed: 03/18/2020; Received: 03/18/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #2) IRS auth Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #2) IRS auth Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: La Dieu, H.; Filed: 02/28/2020; Received: 02/28/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #2) Atty letters

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #2) Atty letters; Filed By: La Dieu, H.; Filed: 02/28/2020; Received: 02/28/2020

REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S) filed by Sugarman

REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S) filed by Sugarman; Filed By: Ferrara, P.; Filed: 02/13/2019; Received: 02/13/2019

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Pesarchick, S.; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Flynn, R.; Filed: 01/23/2019; Received: 01/23/2019

ANSWER of Francis Cauffman (NY), LLP and Francis Cauffman, Inc.

ANSWER of Francis Cauffman (NY), LLP and Francis Cauffman, Inc.; Filed By: Ferrara, P.; Filed: 01/23/2019; Received: 01/23/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: La Dieu, H.; Filed: 12/21/2018; Received: 12/21/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: La Dieu, H.; Filed: 12/21/2018; Received: 12/21/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: La Dieu, H.; Filed: 12/21/2018; Received: 12/21/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: La Dieu, H.; Filed: 12/21/2018; Received: 12/21/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: La Dieu, H.; Filed: 12/05/2018; Received: 12/05/2018

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1); Filed By: Davoli, M.; Filed: 05/22/2020; Received: 05/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1) *Corrected*; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/22/2020; Received: 05/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: La Dieu, H.; Filed: 05/20/2020; Received: 05/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/19/2020; Received: 05/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/23/2020; Received: 04/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: La Dieu, H.; Filed: 03/19/2020; Received: 03/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Davoli, M.; Filed: 03/18/2020; Received: 03/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #2) IRS auth Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: La Dieu, H.; Filed: 02/28/2020; Received: 02/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #2) Atty letters; Filed By: La Dieu, H.; Filed: 02/28/2020; Received: 02/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #2) P VBOP Payroll auth Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: La Dieu, H.; Filed: 02/28/2020; Received: 02/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S) filed by Lippman O'Connor; Filed By: Ferrara, P.; Filed: 02/13/2019; Received: 02/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S) filed by Sugarman; Filed By: Ferrara, P.; Filed: 02/13/2019; Received: 02/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Pesarchick, S.; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Flynn, R.; Filed: 01/23/2019; Received: 01/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER of Francis Cauffman (NY), LLP and Francis Cauffman, Inc.; Filed By: Ferrara, P.; Filed: 01/23/2019; Received: 01/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: La Dieu, H.; Filed: 12/21/2018; Received: 12/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: La Dieu, H.; Filed: 12/21/2018; Received: 12/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: La Dieu, H.; Filed: 12/21/2018; Received: 12/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: La Dieu, H.; Filed: 12/21/2018; Received: 12/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: La Dieu, H.; Filed: 12/05/2018; Received: 12/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less