This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 02/14/2020 at 14:21:25 (UTC).

Westermann Sheehy Keenan Samaan & Aydelott, LLP - v. - Louis Calicchia

Case Summary

On 05/22/2017 Westermann Sheehy Keenan Samaan Aydelott, LLP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Louis Calicchia. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Westermann Sheehy Keenan Samaan & Aydelott, LLP

Defendant

Louis Calicchia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KUZOW, MICHAEL FRANCIS

Attorney at Westermann Sheehy Keenan Samaan & Aydelott, LLP

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

--none--

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

--none--

BILL OF COSTS

--none--

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)

--none--

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

Unpaid Croton-Harmon Invoices

EXHIBIT(S)

Unpaid Ossining Invoices

EXHIBIT(S)

Letter of Engagement

EXHIBIT(S)

Additional Mailing

EXHIBIT(S)

Affidavit of Service

EXHIBIT(S)

Summons and Complaint

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT

--none--

NOTICE OF MOTION

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

--none--

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/16/2018; Received: 02/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Kuzow, M.; Filed: 02/14/2018; Received: 02/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF COSTS; Filed By: Kuzow, M.; Filed: 02/14/2018; Received: 02/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) *Corrected*; Filed By: Kuzow, M.; Filed: 02/14/2018; Received: 02/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/13/2018; Received: 02/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Kuzow, M.; Filed: 10/20/2017; Received: 10/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Kuzow, M.; Filed: 10/20/2017; Received: 10/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - ZZ (Motion #001) Unpaid Croton-Harmon Invoices; Filed By: Kuzow, M.; Filed: 10/20/2017; Received: 10/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - Z (Motion #001) Unpaid Ossining Invoices; Filed By: Kuzow, M.; Filed: 10/20/2017; Received: 10/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - Y (Motion #001) February 7 Decision & Order; Filed By: Kuzow, M.; Filed: 10/20/2017; Received: 10/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Unpaid MS Iron Invoices; Filed By: Kuzow, M.; Filed: 10/20/2017; Received: 10/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Letter of Engagement; Filed By: Kuzow, M.; Filed: 10/20/2017; Received: 10/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Additional Mailing; Filed By: Kuzow, M.; Filed: 10/20/2017; Received: 10/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Kuzow, M.; Filed: 10/20/2017; Received: 10/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Kuzow, M.; Filed: 10/20/2017; Received: 10/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001); Filed By: Kuzow, M.; Filed: 10/20/2017; Received: 10/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Kuzow, M.; Filed: 10/20/2017; Received: 10/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Kuzow, M.; Filed: 07/25/2017; Received: 07/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Kuzow, M.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*; Filed By: Kuzow, M.; Filed: 05/22/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less