This case was last updated from Dutchess County Courts on 02/08/2020 at 19:43:52 (UTC).

WESTCHESTER-HUDSON COAT, APRON, TOWEL AND LINEN SUPPLY CO., INC. - v. - FLORRIE KAYE'S TEA ROOM, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/05/2017 WESTCHESTER-HUDSON COAT, APRON, TOWEL AND LINEN SUPPLY CO , INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FLORRIE KAYE'S TEA ROOM, LLC. This case was filed in Dutchess County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1077

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Dutchess, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESTCHESTER-HUDSON COAT, APRON, TOWEL AND LINEN SUPPLY CO., INC.

Defendant

FLORRIE KAYE'S TEA ROOM, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KLEIN, LEE DAVID

Attorney at LEE DAVID KLEIN, ESQ. ATTORNEY AT LAW

Defendant Attorneys

COVAIS, AMY LORRAINE REED

Attorney at The Law Firm of William G. Sayegh, P.C.

DUBAS, ZENA MARIE

Attorney at Law Office of William G. Sayegh, P.C.

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) stipulation of discontinuance re florrie

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) stipulation of discontinuance re florrie; Filed By: Klein, L.; Filed: 12/21/2017; Received: 12/21/2017

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Dubas, Z.; Filed: 08/31/2017; Received: 08/31/2017

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/10/2017; Received: 08/10/2017

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) notice of appearance re florrie

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) notice of appearance re florrie; Filed By: Klein, L.; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) proposed prelim conf stip re florrie

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) proposed prelim conf stip re florrie; Filed By: Klein, L.; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

APPENDIX Part Rules

APPENDIX Part Rules; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT PLC Scheduling Notice

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT PLC Scheduling Notice; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aff-serv re florrie re disco response

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aff-serv re florrie re disco response; Filed By: Klein, L.; Filed: 07/13/2017; Received: 07/13/2017

RESPONSE TO DEMAND response to combined demands re florrie

RESPONSE TO DEMAND response to combined demands re florrie; Filed By: Klein, L.; Filed: 07/13/2017; Received: 07/13/2017

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS demand for b/p re florrie

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS demand for b/p re florrie; Filed By: Klein, L.; Filed: 07/13/2017; Received: 07/13/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF-SER RE FLORRIE 7-13-17 RE RJI

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF-SER RE FLORRIE 7-13-17 RE RJI; Filed By: Klein, L.; Filed: 07/13/2017; Received: 07/13/2017

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE rji & addendums re florrie

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE rji & addendums re florrie; Filed By: Klein, L.; Filed: 07/13/2017; Received: 07/13/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aff-serv re florrie kaye 7-12-17

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aff-serv re florrie kaye 7-12-17; Filed By: Klein, L.; Filed: 07/12/2017; Received: 07/12/2017

DEMAND FOR: notice re no fax service re florrie kaye

DEMAND FOR: notice re no fax service re florrie kaye; Filed By: Klein, L.; Filed: 07/12/2017; Received: 07/12/2017

DEMAND FOR: Combined Discovery Demands

DEMAND FOR: Combined Discovery Demands; Filed By: Covais, A.; Filed: 07/03/2017; Received: 07/03/2017

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Covais, A.; Filed: 07/03/2017; Received: 07/03/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aff-serv re sec of state

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aff-serv re sec of state; Filed By: Klein, L.; Filed: 05/22/2017; Received: 05/22/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT W/ EXHIBIT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT W/ EXHIBIT; Filed By: Klein, L.; Filed: 05/05/2017; Received: 05/05/2017

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) stipulation of discontinuance re florrie; Filed By: Klein, L.; Filed: 12/21/2017; Received: 12/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Dubas, Z.; Filed: 08/31/2017; Received: 08/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/10/2017; Received: 08/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) notice of appearance re florrie; Filed By: Klein, L.; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) proposed prelim conf stip re florrie; Filed By: Klein, L.; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPENDIX Part Rules; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT PLC Scheduling Notice; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aff-serv re florrie re disco response; Filed By: Klein, L.; Filed: 07/13/2017; Received: 07/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND response to combined demands re florrie; Filed By: Klein, L.; Filed: 07/13/2017; Received: 07/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aff-ser re disco demands re florrie; Filed By: Klein, L.; Filed: 07/13/2017; Received: 07/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION cross depo notice re florrie; Filed By: Klein, L.; Filed: 07/13/2017; Received: 07/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS demand for b/p re florrie; Filed By: Klein, L.; Filed: 07/13/2017; Received: 07/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF-SER RE FLORRIE 7-13-17 RE RJI; Filed By: Klein, L.; Filed: 07/13/2017; Received: 07/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE rji & addendums re florrie; Filed By: Klein, L.; Filed: 07/13/2017; Received: 07/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aff-serv re florrie kaye 7-12-17; Filed By: Klein, L.; Filed: 07/12/2017; Received: 07/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: notice re no fax service re florrie kaye; Filed By: Klein, L.; Filed: 07/12/2017; Received: 07/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Combined Discovery Demands; Filed By: Covais, A.; Filed: 07/03/2017; Received: 07/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Covais, A.; Filed: 07/03/2017; Received: 07/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aff-serv re sec of state; Filed By: Klein, L.; Filed: 05/22/2017; Received: 05/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT W/ EXHIBIT; Filed By: Klein, L.; Filed: 05/05/2017; Received: 05/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less