This case was last updated from Suffolk County Courts on 02/29/2020 at 07:37:40 (UTC).

Wesco Insurance Company et al v. Viceroy Limo Service et al

Case Summary

On 01/30/2020 Wesco Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Viceroy Limo Service. This case was filed in Suffolk County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2020

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Suffolk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Suffolk, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Wesco Insurance Company

Cabana Latina Inc.

Defendants

Viceroy Limo Service

Thomas Shipley

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hunter, Richard Michael

Attorney at Law Offices of John G. Luboja, LLP

Defendant Attorney

LEVEN, ADRIANNE JOY

Attorney at BAKER, McEVOY, MORRISSEY & MOSKOVITS, PC

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Leven, A. - filed by Jordon, S.; Filed: 02/27/2020; Received: 02/27/2020

ANSWER VERIFIED ANSWER, NOTICE FOR DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION AND COMBINED DEMANDS

ANSWER VERIFIED ANSWER, NOTICE FOR DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION AND COMBINED DEMANDS; Filed By: Leven, A. - filed by Jordon, S.; Filed: 02/27/2020; Received: 02/27/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE Service on Viceroy Limo

PROOF OF SERVICE Service on Viceroy Limo; Filed By: Hunter, R.; Filed: 02/12/2020; Received: 02/12/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE Service on Defendant Sipley

PROOF OF SERVICE Service on Defendant Sipley; Filed By: Hunter, R.; Filed: 02/12/2020; Received: 02/12/2020

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected* Summons and Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected* Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Hunter, R.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Leven, A. - filed by Jordon, S.; Filed: 02/27/2020; Received: 02/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER VERIFIED ANSWER, NOTICE FOR DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION AND COMBINED DEMANDS; Filed By: Leven, A. - filed by Jordon, S.; Filed: 02/27/2020; Received: 02/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE Service on Viceroy Limo; Filed By: Hunter, R.; Filed: 02/12/2020; Received: 02/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE Service on Defendant Sipley; Filed By: Hunter, R.; Filed: 02/12/2020; Received: 02/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected* Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Hunter, R.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less