This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/14/2020 at 15:16:14 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR OPTION ONE MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2007-4, ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2007-4 - v. - PATRICIA WATSON A/K/A PATRICIA H. WATSON et al

Case Summary

On 05/23/2017 WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR OPTION ONE MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2007-4, ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2007-4 filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against PATRICIA WATSON A/K/A PATRICIA H WATSON. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR OPTION ONE MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2007-4, ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2007-4

Defendants

LAUNCH DEVELOPMENT LLC

PATRICIA WATSON A/K/A PATRICIA H. WATSON

HOME HEATING OIL CORP.

JOHN DOE #1 THROUGH JOHN DOE #12 the last twelve names being fictitious and unknown to plaintiff, the persons or parties intended being the tenants, occupants, persons or corporations, if any, having or claiming an interest in or lien upon the Subjec

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY DBA PRIMUS FINANCIAL SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MESSINGER, BRETT L

Attorney at DUANE MORRIS, LLP

BORISKIN, SARA Z.

Attorney at RAS BORISKIN, LLC

 

Court Documents

ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY dtd 10/19/18

ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY dtd 10/19/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/06/2018; Received: 12/06/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Messinger, B.; Filed: 08/14/2018; Received: 08/14/2018

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1)

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Messinger, B.; Filed: 08/14/2018; Received: 08/14/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1); Filed By: Messinger, B.; Filed: 08/14/2018; Received: 08/14/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1) of Stuart I. Seiden

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1) of Stuart I. Seiden; Filed By: Messinger, B.; Filed: 08/14/2018; Received: 08/14/2018

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Messinger, B.; Filed: 08/14/2018; Received: 08/14/2018

ORDER - OTHER dtd 3/16/18 nsp (directive)

ORDER - OTHER dtd 3/16/18 nsp (directive); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/19/2018; Received: 04/03/2018

ORDER - OTHER dtd 3/16/18 nsp (directive)

ORDER - OTHER dtd 3/16/18 nsp (directive); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/19/2018; Received: 04/03/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Messinger, B.; Filed: 03/16/2018; Received: 03/16/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS 3215 ON PATRICIA WATSON A/K/A PATRICIA H. WATSON

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS 3215 ON PATRICIA WATSON A/K/A PATRICIA H. WATSON; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/28/2017; Received: 06/28/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS ON PATRICIA WATSON A/K/A PATRICIA H. WATSON

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS ON PATRICIA WATSON A/K/A PATRICIA H. WATSON; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/28/2017; Received: 06/28/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS ON FORD MORTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS ON FORD MORTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/09/2017; Received: 06/09/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS ON HOME HEATING OIL CORP.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS ON HOME HEATING OIL CORP.; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SOS- AOS LAUNCH DEVELOPMENT, LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SOS- AOS LAUNCH DEVELOPMENT, LLC; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/01/2017; Received: 06/01/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY dtd 10/19/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/06/2018; Received: 12/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Messinger, B.; Filed: 08/14/2018; Received: 08/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Messinger, B.; Filed: 08/14/2018; Received: 08/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1); Filed By: Messinger, B.; Filed: 08/14/2018; Received: 08/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1) of Stuart I. Seiden; Filed By: Messinger, B.; Filed: 08/14/2018; Received: 08/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Messinger, B.; Filed: 08/14/2018; Received: 08/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER dtd 3/16/18 nsp (directive); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/19/2018; Received: 04/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER dtd 3/16/18 nsp (directive); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/19/2018; Received: 04/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Messinger, B.; Filed: 03/16/2018; Received: 03/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Messinger, B.; Filed: 03/16/2018; Received: 03/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS NO TENANT ON; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/28/2017; Received: 06/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS 3215 ON PATRICIA WATSON A/K/A PATRICIA H. WATSON; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/28/2017; Received: 06/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS ON PATRICIA WATSON A/K/A PATRICIA H. WATSON; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/28/2017; Received: 06/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS ON FORD MORTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/09/2017; Received: 06/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS ON HOME HEATING OIL CORP.; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SOS- AOS LAUNCH DEVELOPMENT, LLC; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/01/2017; Received: 06/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less